National Railroad Passenger Corporation v. 025 Acres More or Less of Land located at 2034 West Lanvale Street et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Defendant: .025 Acres More or Less of Land located at 2034 West Lanvale Street, 2008 DRR-ETS LLC, EDWARD F GERBER, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, UNKNOWN OWNERS, TENANTS AND PERSONS AND/OR ENTITIES THAT MAY HAVE OR CLAIM AN INTEREST IN 2034 WEST LANVALE STREET, BALTIMORE CITY, MD, Edward F. Gerber and Unknown Owners, Tenants and Persons and/or Entities that may have or Claim an Interest in 2034 West Lanvale Street in Baltimore City, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00408
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 421 Complaint in Condemnation - Eminent Domain
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Other Relief Motion for Immediate Possession by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Leah Gatlin, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of LaToya Genwright, #5 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Camacho, Alejandro)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Camacho, Alejandro)
March 19, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Edward F. Gerber served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Patricia)
March 13, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE by Publication filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mail to Defendant Gerber, #2 Exhibit B - Publisher's Affidavit)(Camacho, Alejandro)
March 12, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Certificate of Diligent Search and Need for Service by Publication as to 2034 West Lanvale Street (Camacho, Alejandro)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro Camacho on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Camacho, Alejandro)
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. 2008 DRR-ETS LLC served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024; Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lambert, Patricia)
February 22, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City.(Webb, Thomas)
February 16, 2024 Wire Received on 2/15/2024 from Pessin Katz Law, P.A. Wire Receipt Voucher Number Number: 650006. Amount: $53,600. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Estimate of Just Compensation. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/14/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)(c/e to finance 2.15.24)
February 14, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to.025 Acres More or Less of Land located at 2034 West Lanvale Street, 2008 DRR-ETS LLC, Edward F. Gerber, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, Unknown Owners, Tenants and Persons and/or Entities that may have or Claim an Interest in 2034 West Lanvale Street in Baltimore City, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2024 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds Plaintiff's Estimate of Just Compensation by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Other Affiliate Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Washington Terminal Company, Other Affiliate American Premier Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate Neri PCC, Inc., Other Affiliate Burlington Northern and Santa Fe LLC, Other Affiliate Canadian Pacific Railway, Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway for NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK.(Lambert, Patricia)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK Declaration of Taking (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Patricia)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Patricia)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Condemnation and Request for Possession against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11082271.), filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Lambert, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Railroad Passenger Corporation v. 025 Acres More or Less of Land located at 2034 West Lanvale Street et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, d/b/a AMTRAK
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Represented By: Alejandro Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .025 Acres More or Less of Land located at 2034 West Lanvale Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 DRR-ETS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD F GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City
Represented By: Thomas Patrick George Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OWNERS, TENANTS AND PERSONS AND/OR ENTITIES THAT MAY HAVE OR CLAIM AN INTEREST IN 2034 WEST LANVALE STREET, BALTIMORE CITY, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F. Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, Tenants and Persons and/or Entities that may have or Claim an Interest in 2034 West Lanvale Street in Baltimore City, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?