Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Stuckey et al
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Rickey Stuckey, III, Emmanuel Savoy, Octavia M Timmons and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00430
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Octavia M Timmons ( c/m on 3/20/2024) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Rickey Stuckey, III ( c/m on 3/20/2024) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Rickey Stuckey, III ( c/m on 3/20/2024) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Emmanuel Savoy ( c/m on 3/20/2024) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Emmanuel Savoy, Rickey Stuckey, III, Octavia M Timmons ( c/m on 3/20/2024) (jks, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(MacDonald, Neil)
March 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Amica Mutual Insurance Company(MacDonald, Neil)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing the plaintiff to file and serve by mail on the above named defendants a Motion for Entry of Default by the Clerk and a Motion for Default Judgment, or provide a report as to why such motions would be inappropriate, within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/14/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2024 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company for Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Gaba, Laura)
March 12, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Gaba, Laura)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Emmanuel Savoy served on 2/17/2024, answer due 3/11/2024.(Schofield, Rachelle)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Rickey Stuckey, III served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024.(Schofield, Rachelle)
February 29, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Octavia M Timmons served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024.(Schofield, Rachelle)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 2/21/2024, answer due 3/13/2024.(Schofield, Rachelle)
February 13, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Emmanuel Savoy, Rickey Stuckey, III, Octavia M Timmons.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (MacDonald, Neil)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Emmanuel Savoy, Rickey Stuckey, III, Octavia M Timmons ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11086468.), filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Summons Summons - Rickey Stuckey, III, #7 Summons Summons - Emmanuel Savoy, #8 Summons Summons - Octavia M. Timmons, #9 Summons Summons - Nationwide)(MacDonald, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Stuckey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Rachelle A Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Stuckey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavia M Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura M Gaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?