Jones-Pearson v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Airicka Jones-Pearson
Defendant: Rafael Lopez, Rebecca Jones Gaston, Ronnica R. Watson and Alger Studstill
Case Number: 1:2024cv00844
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of voluntary dismissal. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 5/13/2024. (nd4s, Chambers)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Rebecca Jones Gaston, Alger Studstill, Rafael Lopez and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 5/13/2024. (nd4s, Chambers)
May 13, 2024 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rebecca Jones Gaston, Rafael Lopez, Alger Studstill(Kurlander, Elise)
April 26, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE by Rafael Lopez re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Certificate of Service (Kurlander, Elise)
April 26, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rafael Lopez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurlander, Elise)
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alger Studstill.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Airicka Jones-Pearson re #11 Amended Complaint, (Halperin, Jonathan)
April 12, 2024 Filing 14 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #11 Amended Complaint, by Airicka Jones-Pearson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Declaration of Plaintiff)(Halperin, Jonathan)
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #11 Amended Complaint, filed by Airicka Jones-Pearson was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for defendant Alger Studstill. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons for defendant Alger Studstill to #11 Amended Complaint. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2024 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Amended Complaint, filed by Airicka Jones-Pearson was filed incorrectly. **In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 and Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1, the parties must refrain from including or must redact the following: Names of minor children. If a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of the child should be used. Your initial Amended Complaint has been accepted as an UNREDACTED Version of the Amended Complaint. Please file a REDACTED version of the Amended Complaint with initials for all minor children. Use the Event Redacted Document, which is found under Other Filings -> Other Documents -> Redacted Document. Also please modify the entry to state is it the Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 UNREDACTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Airicka Jones-Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Complaint with Amendments Identified)(Halperin, Jonathan) Modified on 4/12/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Rafael Lopez re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Proposed Order (Kurlander, Elise)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rafael Lopez was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. Pursuant to Local Rule 105.1, all Motions must be accompanied with a memorandum in support and proposed order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #8 Motion to Dismiss. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rafael Lopez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kurlander, Elise)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Rafael Lopez Defendant Statement Pursuant to Standing Order (Kurlander, Elise)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Rafael Lopez (Kurlander, Elise)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Statement Pursuant to Standing Order 2021-13 by Airicka Jones-Pearson (Halperin, Jonathan) Modified on 3/26/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY, MARYLAND. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 UNREDACTED COMPLAINT filed in Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland against Rebecca Jones Gaston, Rafael Lopez, Ronnica R. Watson, filed by Airicka Jones-Pearson.(ah8s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/12/2024 (bw5s, Deputy Clerk).
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by Lopez Rafael. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Service, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed in Circuit Court, #3 Exhibit Circuit Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Local Rule 103.5 Certification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurlander, Elise)
March 21, 2024 The case of Jones-Pearson v. Gaston et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:24-cv-00844-BAH. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2024 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11160837(Kurlander, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Pearson v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airicka Jones-Pearson
Represented By: Howard Norman Berliner
Represented By: Jonathan E Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Lopez
Represented By: Elise Song Kurlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Jones Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnica R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alger Studstill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?