Nagengast v. Fiorello
Plaintiff: Annette Nagengast
Defendant: Nicholas Fiorello
Case Number: 1:2024cv01103
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nicholas Fiorello re #2 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court File Summary, #2 Attachment Notice of Removal Package, #3 Attachment Certified Mail Card, #4 Attachment State Court Writ of Summons, #5 Attachment State Court Complaint)(Farber, Molissa)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond re #3 Complaint; Nicholas Fiorello answer due 6/17/2024. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 4/18/2024. (c/m p 4/18/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m p 4/16/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2024 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nicholas Fiorello, filed by Annette Nagengast. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Nicholas Fiorello(Farber, Molissa)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5(Farber, Molissa)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number D-08-CV-24-014446., filed by Nicholas Fiorello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Summons, #3 State Court Complaint)(Farber, Molissa)
April 16, 2024 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagengast v. Fiorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Nagengast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Fiorello
Represented By: Molissa Heather Farber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?