Stemcells, Inc. et al v. Neuralstem, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2006cv01877
Filed: July 24, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
Presiding Judge: William Connelly
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/22/2015. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling a telephone conference for October 8, 2014 at 11:30 a.m re 420 Motion for Pretrial Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/3/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling a pretrial conference for November 26,2014 at 10:00 a.m.; setting dates for pretrial filings. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 9/3/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 04/06/2012. (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/6/2012 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (c/m 04/06/2012 bca)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/11/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 10/30/09. (ch, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stemcells, Inc. et al v. Neuralstem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?