Recorded Books, LLC v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. Featured Case

Breach of contract, copyright, Lanham Act claims against OCLC/NetLibrary

Plaintiff: Recorded Books, LLC
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Counter Claimant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Recorded Books, LLC
Case Number: 8:2007cv01427
Filed: May 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Calvert
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2007 Filing 43
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Recorded Books, LLC, OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Hosp, R)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42
ORDER GRANTING 41 Joint Motion for Order of Dismissal and DISMISSING this case without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/13/07. (Chasanow, Deborah)
September 20, 2007 Filing 40
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hosp, R)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and status reprot due 1/22/2008, motions due 2/19/2008. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/6/07. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 31, 2007 Filing 38
ANSWER to 37 Amended Counterclaim by Recorded Books, LLC.(Hosp, R) Modified on 8/31/2007 (elt, Deputy Clerk).
July 25, 2007 Filing 34
RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Declaration of Scott Wasinger in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc..Replies due by 8/8/2007. (Marbury, Hugh)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27
LETTER/ORDER CONFIRMING the matters discussed and schedule set during the telephone conference on 6/25/07, CONFIRMING a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on July 24, 2007, at 1:00 p.m. and continuing, if necessary, at 9:00 a.m. on July 25, 2007. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/26/07. (Chasanow, Deborah)
June 21, 2007 Filing 24
MOTION by Jason Prussman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. (aap, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2007 Filing 18
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Recorded Books, LLC (Hosp, R)
June 12, 2007 Filing 8
MOTION by R. Davids Hosp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Recorded Books, LLC. (aap, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2007 Filing 5
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Recorded Books, LLC. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. served on 6/1/2007, answer due 6/21/2007. (Permut, David)
June 1, 2007 Filing 4
Correspondence: Report on Copyright Action. (ch, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2007 Filing 2
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Recorded Books, LLC. (ch, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recorded Books, LLC v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recorded Books, LLC
Represented By: Jaren D Wilcoxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R Prussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R Prussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Recorded Books, LLC
Represented By: Jaren D Wilcoxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?