Muhammad v. Williamson-Crawl et al
Plaintiff: Raheem Muhammad
Defendant: Rosemary Williamson-Crawl, Angela Bonsu, Michelle Reed, Jack McShea, Jack McShea, III, Timothy McShea, Joel Torres, Candice Hebron, Karind Garcia, Yankee Mukadi, Isiah Legget, Annie Alston, Lillian Durham, Jerry Robinson, Joy Flood, Gail Willison, Jamie B. Miller, Jr., Michael J. Katur, Jean Banks, Roberto Pinero, Norman Cohen, Norman M. Dreyfuss, Pamela Lindstrom, Sally Roman, Antonia Adams, James Watkins, Donna Jackson, Wanda Seymore, Arie Robinson, Marsha Smith, Eric Axelrod, Timothy Beckett, Monica Blount-Hart, Marilyn Fox, Jacqueline Ghunaim, LaTonya Hamilton, Mariska Mends, Fran Jamieson-Unger, Karen Jeffries, Lecia Stein, James L. Stowe, Odessa M. Shannon, David Hughley, Richard Y. Nelson, Jr., Joseph Giloley, Michael T. Denney, Jane Blackwell, McShea Management Incorporated, Alexander Development Corporation, Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County, Maryland, Montgomery County Maryland, Montgomery County, Maryland Office of Human Rights, Montgomery County, Maryland, Department of Housing and Community Affairs, District Court of Maryland, State of Maryland, Michael Conroy, Stephen A. Johnson, Patricia L. Mitchell, Gary Lewis Crawford, Brian G. Kim, James B. Sarsfield, Gary G. Evernga, Cheryl Ann McCally, Eugene Wolf, Barry A. Hamilton, William G. Simmons, Carolyn Beale, Tiwana Richardson, Ri Sheryll, Kevin B. McParland, Douglas M. Bregman, Laurence H. Berbert, Timothy P. Schwartz, Mark A. Gilday, Law Offices of Bregman, Berbert, Schwartz and Gilday and Benjamin C. Clyburn
Case Number: 8:2008cv02971
Filed: November 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 cv Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2010 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 10-1584 for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Raheem Muhammad. Case Manager - Gena Krawcheck (nrm, Deputy Clerk) FILED IN ERROR
January 14, 2010 Filing 18 MANDATE of USCA takes effect today as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Raheem Muhammad (krc, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2009 Filing 17 JUDGMENT of USCA "DISMISSING" appeal as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Raheem Muhammad (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion)(ch, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2009 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial (krc, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal (c/m to Plaintiff 1/22/09 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/22/09. (sat, Chambers)
January 21, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-1091 for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Raheem Muhammad (Case Manager - Merlene Smith-Taylor) (krc, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2009 Filing 15 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (krc, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Raheem Muhammad (krc, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2009 Filing 13 Request for Reasonable Accommodations by Person(s) with Disabilities by Raheen Muhammad (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(kn, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate #11 Order Dismissing the Complaint Pursuant to Rules 59(e) and 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Raheen Muhammad. Responses due by 1/30/2009. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(kn, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING the complaint without prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case (c/m to Plaintiff 1/8/09 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/8/09. (Chasanow, Deborah)
December 29, 2008 Filing 10 AMENDED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kevin B. McParland, Douglas M. Bregman, Laurence H. Berbert, Timothy P. Schwartz, Mark A. Gilday, Law Offices of Bregman, Berbert, Schwartz and Gilday, Benjamin C. Clyburn, Karind Garcia, Yankee Mukadi, Isiah Legget, Annie Alston, Lillian Durham, Jerry Robinson, Joy Flood, Gail Willison, Jamie B. Miller, Jr, Michael J. Katur, Jean Banks, Roberto Pinero, Norman Cohen, Norman M. Dreyfuss, Pamela Lindstrom, Sally Roman, Antonia Adams, James Watkins, Donna Jackson, Wanda Seymore, Rosemary Williamson-Crawl, Arie Robinson, Marsha Smith, Eric Axelrod, Timothy Beckett, Monica Blount-Hart, Marilyn Fox, Jacqueline Ghunaim, LaTonya Hamilton, Angela Bonsu, Mariska Mends, Fran Jamieson-Unger, Karen Jeffries, Lecia Stein, James L. Stowe, Odessa M. Shannon, David Hughley, Richard Y. Nelson, Jr, Joseph Giloley, Michael T. Denney, Michelle Reed, Jane Blackwell, McShea Management Incorporated, Alexander Development Corporation, Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County, Maryland, Montgomery County Maryland, Montgomery County, Maryland Office of Human Rights, Montgomery County, Maryland, Department of Housing and Community Affairs, District Court of Maryland, State of Maryland, Michael Conroy, Jack McShea, Stephen A. Johnson, Patricia L. Mitchell, Gary Lewis Crawford, Brian G. Kim, James B. Sarsfield, Gary G. Evernga, Cheryl Ann McCally, Eugene Wolf, Barry A. Hamilton, William G. Simmons, Jack McShea, III, Timothy McShea, Joel Torres, Carolyn Beale, Tiwana Richardson, Ri Sheryll, Candice Hebron, filed by Raheen Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Verification, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Cover Letter)(elt, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion to Vacate, DENYING #8 Motion for Recusal, and DIRECTING Plaintiff to supplement his complaint by 12/30/08 (c/m to Plaintiff 12/19/08 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/19/08. (Chasanow, Deborah)
December 12, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for Recusal (Motion to Vatate 12/9/08 Order of Court) by Raheen Muhammad Responses due by 12/29/2008 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion to Vacate by Raheen Muhammad Responses due by 12/29/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(rank, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Vacate the court's order dated November 18, 2008 (c/m to Plaintiff 12/9/08 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/9/08. (Chasanow, Deborah)
November 24, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate November 17, 2008 Order of Court #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Raheen Muhammad Responses due by 12/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(elt, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff twenty days to supplement the complaint in regards to McShae and Hoc defendant's and provide addition claims of discrimination based on releigion against Yankee Mukadi ; dismissing the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/17/08. (c/m 11/17/08 rk) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2008 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/17/08. (c/m 11/17/08 rk) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raheen Muhammad (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2008 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against Karind Garcia, Yankee Mukadi, Isiah Legget, Annie Alston, Lillian Durham, Jerry Robinson, Joy Flood, Gail Willison, Jamie B. Miller, Jr, Michael J. Katur, Jean Banks, Roberto Pinero, Norman Cohen, Norman M. Dreyfuss, Pamela Lindstrom, Sally Roman, Antonia Adams, James Watkins, Donna Jackson, Wanda Seymore, Rosemary Williamson-Crawl, Arie Robinson, Marsha Smith, Eric Axelrod, Timothy Beckett, Monica Blount-Hart, Marilyn Fox, Jacqueline Ghunaim, LaTonya Hamilton, Angela Bonsu, Mariska Mends, Fran Jamieson-Unger, Karen Jeffries, Lecia Stein, James L. Stowe, Odessa M. Shannon, David Hughley, Richard Y. Nelson, Joseph Giloley, Michael T. Denney, Michelle Reed, Jane Blackwell, McShea Management Incorporated, Alexander House Apartments, Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County, Maryland, Montgomery County Maryland, Montgomery County, Maryland Office of Human Rights, Montgomery County, Maryland, Department of Housing and Community Affairs, District Court of Maryland, State Of Maryland, Michael Conroy, Jack McShea, Stephen A. Johnson, Patricia L. Mitchell, Gary Lewis Crawford, Brian G. Kim, James B. Sarsfield, Gary G. Evernga, Ann McCally, Eugene Wolf, Barry A. Hamilton, William G. Simmons, Jack McShea, III, Timothy McShea, Joel Torres, Candice Hebron, filed by Raheen Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ljs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Williamson-Crawl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raheem Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Williamson-Crawl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Bonsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McShea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy McShea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Hebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karind Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yankee Mukadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isiah Legget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Willison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie B. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Katur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Pinero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman M. Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Seymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Blount-Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Ghunaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaTonya Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariska Mends
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fran Jamieson-Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lecia Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Stowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odessa M. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hughley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Y. Nelson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giloley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McShea Management Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland Office of Human Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland, Department of Housing and Community Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Court of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia L. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lewis Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian G. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Sarsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary G. Evernga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Ann McCally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry A. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Beale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiwana Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ri Sheryll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. McParland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas M. Bregman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence H. Berbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Gilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Bregman, Berbert, Schwartz and Gilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C. Clyburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?