Doll v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Eric Gregory Doll
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 8:2010cv01505
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTED #51 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr. on April 23, 2013. (vdj, Chambers)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company. (McCauley, John)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Jury Trial Demand by Ford Motor Company. (nss, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(McCauley, John) Courtesy copy received - submitted to Chambers. Modified on 9/20/2011 (nss, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #48 re Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint Ford Motor Company answer due 9/26/2011. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr. on September 12, 2011. (vj, Chambers)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company Responses due by 9/26/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCauley, John)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint Request for Conference (McCauley, John)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2012. Status Report due by 1/9/2012. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/26/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/25/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/25/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Nathan Berk (Berk, Steven)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robert K. Shelquist on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Robert K. Shelquist to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/11. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jay P. Saltzman on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Jay P. Saltzman to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/11. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 3/9/2011. (ns, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll Robert K. Shelquist ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2897223.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll Jay P. Saltzman ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2897216.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Request for Hearing)(Gaarder, Christina)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 1/13/11 ( Williams, Alexander)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/31/2011 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaarder, Christina)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting re #33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 12/21/10 ( Williams, Alexander)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 12/31/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaarder, Christina)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended filed by Eric Gregory Doll. Replies due by 12/27/2010. (Pavsner, Steven)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Stipulation/Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 12/8/10 ( Williams, Alexander)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Eric Gregory Doll Responses due by 12/20/2010 (Maloney, Timothy)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Steven N Berk on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Steven N Berk to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/24/10. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Joel Rubenstein on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Joel Rubenstein to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/24/10. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven N. Berk on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2765490.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel Rubenstein on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2764737.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER "Granting" #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 11/17/10 ( Williams, Alexander)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time by Eric Gregory Doll Responses due by 12/2/2010 (Maloney, Timothy)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on Plaintiff Michael Regensburger's Claims in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company Responses due by 11/18/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Undisputed Material Facts, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(McCauley, John)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER "Granting" #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 9/28/10 ( Williams, Alexander)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company Responses due by 10/15/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaarder, Christina)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Eric Gregory Doll.(Pavsner, Steven)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER "Granting" #18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 8/26/10 (Williams, Alexander)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time by Eric Gregory Doll Responses due by 9/7/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pavsner, Steven)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure of Corporate Interest filed by Ford Motor Company (McCauley, John) Modified on 8/10/2010 (elts, Deputy Clerk).
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Ford Motor Company Responses due by 8/23/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCauley, John)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Nathan Curtis Zipperian on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Nathan Curtis Zipperian to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 07/12/2010. (md, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James Craig Shah on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney James Craig Shah to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 07/12/2010. (md, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James Edward Miller on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney James Edward Miller to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 07/12/2010. (md, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Rose F. Luzon on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Rose F. Luzon to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 07/12/2010. (md, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan C. Zipperian on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2595181.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James C. Shah on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2595166.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James E. Miller on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2595136.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rose F. Luzon on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2595107.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER "Granting" #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 7/1/10 ( Williams, Alexander)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ford Motor Company Responses due by 7/19/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaarder, Christina)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mark F. Anderson on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll. Directing attorney Mark F. Anderson to register on-line for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attorney/registration.asp. Signed by Clerk on 06/22/2010. (md, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark F. Anderson on behalf of Eric Gregory Doll ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-2571882.) by Eric Gregory Doll (Pavsner, Steven)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Corporation Trust Incorporated, Registered Agent for Ford Motor Company on June 16, 2010, filed by Eric Gregory Doll. (Pavsner, Steven)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ford Motor Company. (elts, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Jury Trial Demand by Eric Gregory Doll. (elts, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-2556200.), filed by Eric Gregory Doll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pavsner, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doll v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gregory Doll
Represented By: Steven M Pavsner
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James Craig Shah
Represented By: Jay P Saltzman
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Mark F Anderson
Represented By: Nathan Curtis Zipperian
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Rose F Luzon
Represented By: Steven Nathan Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John Arthur McCauley
Represented By: Christina Lee Gaarder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?