Reyazuddin v. Montgomery County, Maryland
Plaintiff: Yasmin Reyazuddin
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland
Case Number: 8:2011cv00951
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/19/2019. (sat, Chambers)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/21/2017. (sat, Chambers)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/20/14. (sat, Chambers)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/18/12. (sat, Chambers)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/27/12. (sat, Chambers)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/4/12. (sat, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyazuddin v. Montgomery County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Reyazuddin
Represented By: Timothy R Elder
Represented By: Joseph B Espo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?