McFeeley et al v. Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Laura McFeeley and Danielle Everett
Defendant: Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC, Risque, LLC, Quantum Entertainment Group, LLC, Nico Enterprises, Inc., XTC Entertainment Group, LLC. and Uwa Offiah
Counter_claimant: Nico Enterprises, Inc., Risque, LLC, Quantum Entertainment Group, LLC, Uwa Offiah, XTC Entertainment Group, LLC. and Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC
Counter_defendant: Laura McFeeley and Danielle Everett
Case Number: 8:2012cv01019
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/15/2016. (sat, Chambers)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/13/2016. (sat, Chambers)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/5/2015. (sat, Chambers)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/10/2015. (sat, Chambers)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Clementina Ibe for Plaintiff Scharlene Alugbuo 9/15/14 sat). Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/15/14. (sat, Chambers)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Nicole Gray and Clementina Ibe for Plaintiff Scharlene Alugbuo 8/19/14 sat). Signed by Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/19/14. (sat, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFeeley et al v. Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McFeeley
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Everett
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risque, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Entertainment Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nico Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTC Entertainment Group, LLC.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uwa Offiah
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nico Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Risque, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Quantum Entertainment Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Uwa Offiah
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: XTC Entertainment Group, LLC.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jackson Street Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Laura McFeeley
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Danielle Everett
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?