Papanicolas v. Project Execution and Control Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Papanicolas
Defendant: Project Execution and Control Consulting, LLC and Barington Cromuel
Case Number: 8:2012cv01579
Filed: May 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Charles
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/31/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 3/8/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 4/27/2015. (c/m 4/28/15)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 3/17/2015. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papanicolas v. Project Execution and Control Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Papanicolas
Represented By: Joseph M Creed
Represented By: Brian Joseph Markovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Execution and Control Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Roberto N Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barington Cromuel
Represented By: Roberto N Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?