Salinas et al v. Commercial Interiors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mario Salinas, William Ascencio, Bernaldino Salinas, Jose Dolores Mancia, Osmel Hernandez, Henry Garcia Viera and Franklin Henriquez
Defendant: Commercial Interiors, Inc., J.I. General Contractors, Inc., Juan Flores Ramirez and Isaias Flores Ramirez
Case Number: 8:2012cv01973
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2fl Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 170 Motion for Attorneys' fees; adopting 180 Report and Recommendations; JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees awarded to Plaintiffs against Defendants; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/16/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 170 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by William Ascencio, Mario Salinas, Franklin Henriquez, Bernaldino Salinas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/8/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 133 Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/19/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to plaintiffs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/5/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/17/2014. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 15 Motion of Commercial Interiors, Inc. to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/14/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas et al v. Commercial Interiors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Salinas
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ascencio
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernaldino Salinas
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Dolores Mancia
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osmel Hernandez
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Garcia Viera
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Henriquez
Represented By: Sally Dworak Fisher
Represented By: Keira Marie McNett
Represented By: Andrea Joie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Interiors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.I. General Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Culp Lovett
Represented By: Peter S Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Flores Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaias Flores Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?