Nam v. 7-Eleven

Plaintiff: Djiby Nam
Defendant: 7-Eleven
Case Number: 8:2013cv00546
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER amending the Scheduling Order; Status Report now due: 2/26/2016. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/6/2015. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified to include (c/m on 11/6/2015).(kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/27/2015. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 10/27/15)
January 29, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 7 Motion for Default Judgment; GRANTING 9 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 01/28/2014. (c/m 1/29/14)(ads, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nam v. 7-Eleven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djiby Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?