Ward et al v. Branch Banking and Trust et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Ward and Dierdre Ward
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust and The Fisher Law Group, PLLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv01968
Filed: July 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/22/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/25/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/17/2016. (c/m 5/18/2016 nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/4/2015. (c/m 8/4/2015 nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/2/2015. (c/m 3/3/2015 nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 06/13/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/13/2014 bca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Branch Banking and Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dierdre Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust
Represented By: John Jun Young Lee
Represented By: Brian L Moffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fisher Law Group, PLLC
Represented By: Scott Randal Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?