Chaplick v. Mao et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Chaplick
Defendant: Jeng Fen Mao and Chiayee Chew Mao
Case Number: 8:2013cv02070
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Paul W. Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/5/2016. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/25/2016. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 03/04/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaplick v. Mao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Chaplick
Represented By: Paul Stephen Caiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeng Fen Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiayee Chew Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?