O'Brien v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plaintif of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Brien and Maaza O'Brien
Defendant: M.D. Napoleon Magpantay, III, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., SHC Services, Inc., Civista Care Partners, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C., Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., Civista Health, Inc., M.D. Puneet Chopra, LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. and Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC
Case Number: 8:2014cv00190
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Charles
Presiding Judge: William Connelly
Referring Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #189 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Contingent Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/25/15. (rass, Chambers)
June 25, 2015 Filing 189 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/24/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #187 Joint Motion for Local Rule 111 Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/24/2015. (rass, Chambers)
June 24, 2015 Filing 187 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment Civista Health, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Gerard)
June 17, 2015 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #142 Second MOTION in Limine Civista Health, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 Second MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Second Motion in Limine filed by Puneet Chopra, Civista Health, Inc., Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC, Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 17, 2015 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION in Limine Civista Health, Inc.'s First Motion in Limine filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION in Limine First Motion in Limine filed by Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 17, 2015 Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claim of Lack of Informed Consent filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION in Limine First Motion in Limine Defendant LiquidAgents Healthcare, LLC Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiffs Consented to the Transfer of Maaza O'Brien, and Related Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Consent Related Evidence and Argument Against LiquidAgents filed by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Keith)
June 17, 2015 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim of Negligence filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 17, 2015 Filing 177 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant LiquidAgents HealthCare, LLC's Motion for Jury Instructions Regarding Defendant LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc.'s Spoliation of Evidence by Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 7/6/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 17, 2015 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION in Limine First Motion in Limine Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiffs Consented to the Transfer of Maaza O'Brien filed by Civista Health, Inc.. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
June 16, 2015 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 16, 2015 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION Motion for Jury Instructions Regarding Defendant Lifestar Response of Maryland, Inc.'s Spoliation of Evidence filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 16, 2015 Filing 172 (FILED IN ERROR- PER COUNSEL WILL REFILE)RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis) Modified on 6/16/2015 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
June 16, 2015 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony or Evidence for Gratuitous Care filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 16, 2015 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Testimony Regarding Licensed Nursing for Future Home Health Care filed by Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM/ORDER to Counsel. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/15/2015. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM/ORDER to Counsel. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/15/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2015 Filing 168 Supplemental to #154 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant Civista Health Inc., currently known as University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc., d/b/a University of Maryland Charles Regional Medical Centers Second Motion in Limine filed by Civista Health, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Keith)
June 15, 2015 Filing 167 MOTION in Limine Def Liquid Agents Joinder in Def Kaiser Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Testimony or Evidence and Testimony Re Licensed Nursing for Future Home Health Care by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 7/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Keith)
June 15, 2015 Filing 166 MOTION in Limine Def Liquid Agents Joinder in Def Kaiser Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony or Evidence for Gratuitous Care by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 7/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Keith)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DATE ON MOTIONS HEARING set for 7/6/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Peter J. Messitte. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/10/2015. (vdj, Chambers)
June 10, 2015 Filing 164 MOTION for Joinder Defendant Kaiser Motion In Limine Preclude Testimony on Issue of Informed Consent by Puneet Chopra, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/29/2015 (Farley, Robert)
June 10, 2015 Filing 163 MOTION for Joinder Defendant Civista's Second Motion In Limine by Puneet Chopra, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/29/2015 (Farley, Robert)
June 10, 2015 Filing 162 MOTION for Joinder In Defendant Liquidagents Motion For Jury Instructions Re Spoliation Of Evidence by Puneet Chopra, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/29/2015 (Farley, Robert)
June 9, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant LiquidAgents Healthcare, LLC's Motion for Jury Instructions Regarding Defendant LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc's Spoliation of Evidence by Civista Health, Inc. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
June 9, 2015 Filing 160 MOTION in Limine Joinder by Puneet Chopra, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Farley, Robert)
June 9, 2015 Filing 159 MOTION in Limine Joinder by Puneet Chopra, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Farley, Robert)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MARGINAL ORDER granting #157 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/8/2015. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2015 Filing 157 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Terranova, Jodi)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM/ ORDER scheduling a motions hearing on Monday July 6, 2015; setting dates for the filing of briefs. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/4/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MARGINAL ORDER granting #138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/2/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2015 Filing 154 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant Civista Health Inc., currently known as University of Maryland Charles Regional Health, Inc., d/b/a University of Maryland Charles Regional Medical Centers Second Motion in Limine by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aygun, Serra)
June 3, 2015 Filing 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim of Negligence by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 3, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to the Claim of Lack of Informed Consent by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 3, 2015 Filing 151 MOTION Motion for Jury Instructions Regarding Defendant Lifestar Response of Maryland, Inc.'s Spoliation of Evidence by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Keith)
June 3, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and Testimony Regarding Licensed Nursing for Future Home Health Care by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 3, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony or Evidence for Gratuitous Care by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 3, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Terranova, Jodi)
June 3, 2015 Filing 147 Third MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Third Motion in Limine by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 3, 2015 Filing 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment Civista Health, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Civista Health, Inc. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
June 3, 2015 Filing 145 Second MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Second Motion in Limine by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 3, 2015 Filing 144 MOTION in Limine First Motion in Limine by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
June 3, 2015 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10)(Burnett, Andrew)
June 3, 2015 Filing 142 Second MOTION in Limine Civista Health, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine by Civista Health, Inc. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
June 3, 2015 Filing 141 MOTION in Limine Civista Health, Inc.'s First Motion in Limine by Civista Health, Inc. Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
June 2, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3-23-15, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Marshall, Telephone number 301-344-3229. Total number of pages filed: 99. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (lcm, Court Reporter)
June 2, 2015 Filing 139 STATUS REPORT by Maaza O'Brien. (Mitchell, Denis)
June 1, 2015 Filing 138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 6/18/2015 (Mitchell, Denis)
May 29, 2015 Filing 137 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record - to clarify that trial will be held Tuesday, July 14 though Friday, July 17; Monday, July 20th through Tuesday, July 21; Thursday, July 23 through Friday, July 24; Tuesday, July 28th through Friday, July 31st. (vj, Chambers) (vdj, Chambers)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MARGINAL ORDER granting #135 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/26/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2015 Filing 135 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Entry of Agreed to Protective Order) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice #133 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Agreed to Protective Order). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/18/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2015 Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Agreed to Protective Order) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 6/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
May 5, 2015 Filing 132 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE confirming that an IN-CHAMBERS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte has been scheduled for Monday, June 29, 2015 at 4:45 p.m. (and attaching Judge Messitte's Memorandum re: Trial Procedures in Civil Cases). Pursuant to Local Rule 106, the Joint Pre-Trial Order should be filed no later than 5 business days before the Pre-Trial Conference (by June 22, 2015). (rass, Chambers)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #130 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/5/2015. (rass, Chambers)
May 4, 2015 Filing 130 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Modify The Scheduling Order by Civista Health, Inc. Responses due by 5/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM ORDER setting dates for Pre-Trial submissions. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/27/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PAPERLESS ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #117 Defendant Magpantay's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date & Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/27/2015. (rass, Chambers)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #126 Stipulaiton of Dismissal as to Defendant Napolean Magpantay, III, M.D. Only. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/17/2015. (rass, Chambers)
April 16, 2015 Filing 126 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Napolean Magpantay, III, M.D. by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. (Mitchell, Denis)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #124 Consent Motion for Mediation. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/14/2015. (rass, Chambers)
April 10, 2015 Filing 124 Consent MOTION for Mediation by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
April 10, 2015 Filing 123 Correspondence re: phone conference regarding pending motion of Dr. Magpantay to postpone the trial date (Mitchell, Gerard)
April 7, 2015 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 4/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Mitchell, Denis)
April 3, 2015 Filing 121 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that they should DISREGARD 120 Paperless Correspondence and that the TELECONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte in connection with #117 Motion filed by Defendant Magpantay's is CONFIRMED for Wednesday, April 8, 2015 at 4:45 p.m. Counsel should initiate the teleconference to Chambers. PLEASE NOTE: A Court Reporter will be present during the teleconference. (rass, Chambers)
April 3, 2015 Filing 120 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that Wednesday, April 8, 2015 (at 4:45 p.m.) for the TELECONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte regarding #117 Motion filed by Defendant Magpantay is no longer available. The times for Monday, April 6, 2015 (between 2:30 p.m. and 4:45 p.m.) and Tuesday, April 7, 2015 (at 4:45 p.m. only) will be held open until we hear back from the parties on Monday, April 6, 2015 (by no later than 11:00 a.m.) as to a confirmed date and time. (rass, Chambers)
April 3, 2015 Filing 119 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record - in recognition of the upcoming holidays - extending the time for the parties to jointly contact Chambers until 11:00 a.m. on Monday, April 6, 2015 to schedule a future TELECONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte (at his direction) for a time during the afternoon of Monday, April 6, 2015 (between 2:30 p.m. and 4:45 p.m.), or alternatively on Tuesday, April 7, 2015 or Wednesday, April 8, 2015 (at 4:45 p.m.) to discuss #117 Defendant Magpantay's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date and Modification of Scheduling Order. (rass, Chambers)
April 3, 2015 Filing 118 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE directing the parties to jointly contact Chambers by close of business today (Friday, April 3, 2015) to schedule a future TELECONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte (at his direction) for a time during the afternoon of Monday, April 6, 2015, or alternatively on Tuesday, April 7, 2015 or Wednesday, April 8, 2015 (at 4:45 p.m.) to discuss #117 Defendant Magpantay's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date and Modification of Scheduling Order. (rass, Chambers)
March 31, 2015 Filing 117 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Napoleon Magpantay, III Responses due by 4/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaslick, Mary)
March 31, 2015 Filing 116 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint by Napoleon Magpantay, III.(Kaslick, Mary)
March 25, 2015 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Napoleon Magpantay, III served on 3/10/2015, answer due 3/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 25, 2015 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Puneet Chopra served on 3/10/2015, answer due 3/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying #71 Motion for Summary Judgment; deferring ruling on #92 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/25/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2015 Filing 112 Correspondence re: trial date (Mitchell, Denis)
March 23, 2015 Filing 111 Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2015 re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: Marshall (4C) (esp, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2015 Filing 110 Supplemental to #87 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Terranova, Jodi)
March 18, 2015 Filing 109 Supplemental to #87 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 16)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 17, 2015 Filing 108 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC.(Bonner, Keith)
March 17, 2015 Filing 107 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C..(Terranova, Jodi)
March 17, 2015 Filing 106 STIPULATION re #91 Reply to Response to Motion, #87 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Terranova, Jodi)
March 17, 2015 Filing 105 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) by LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc..(Emig, Gerard)
March 13, 2015 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Terranova, Jodi)
March 12, 2015 Filing 103 Civista Health, Inc.'s Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint and Defenses to 1st Amended Complaint ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint by Civista Health, Inc..(Smith, Michele)
March 9, 2015 Filing 102 ANSWER to #97 Amended Complaint by Puneet Chopra.(Farley, Robert)
March 6, 2015 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 3/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 6, 2015 Filing 100 Summons Issued 21 days as to Puneet Chopra, Napoleon Magpantay, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2015 Filing 99 NOTICE by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien re #97 Amended Complaint For the clerk to issue summons (Mitchell, Denis)
March 4, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien re #97 Amended Complaint For the clerk to issue summons (Mitchell, Denis)
March 4, 2015 Filing 97 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 2nd Amended Complaint Redline)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 3, 2015 Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Derek S Davis. Directing attorney Derek S Davis to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 3/3/2015. (bu, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #82 Plaintiffs' (Partially Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/2/2015. (rass, Chambers)
March 3, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Derek S. Davis ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5250543.) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Terranova, Jodi)
February 20, 2015 Filing 93 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that, due to a conflict in the Court calendar, the MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Peter J. Messitte scheduled for Monday, March 2, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED to Monday, March 23, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom 4C). Counsel should jointly contact Chambers by no later than close of business on Wednesday, February 25, 2015 if the new motions hearing date (March 23, 2015 at 10:00 a.m.) is not good on their calendar(s) and needs to be rescheduled. (rass, Chambers)
February 17, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION for Protective Order by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 3/6/2015 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
January 30, 2015 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Terranova, Jodi)
January 16, 2015 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Praecipe filed by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. Replies due by 2/2/2015. (Farley, Robert)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #88 Defendant Lifestar Response of Maryland, Inc.'s Consent Motion to Extend Time for Filing Expert Witness Disclosures. The deadline is hereby EXTENDED to February 15, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 1/13/2015. (nk, Chambers)
January 7, 2015 Filing 88 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Expert Witness Disclosures by LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Emig, Gerard)
January 6, 2015 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Disputed Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Mitchell, Denis)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MARGINAL ORDER GRANTING #84 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ; Responses due by 1/23/2015. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/29/2014. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MARGINAL ORDER GRANTING #83 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Responses due by 1/6/2015; Replies due by 1/30/2015. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/29/2014. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Responses due by 1/15/2015 (Farley, Robert)
December 28, 2014 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Responses due by 1/15/2015 (Mitchell, Denis)
December 19, 2014 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 1/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Mitchell, Denis)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #69 Defendants' Joint Motion to Order a Rule 35 Medical Evaluation of Plaintiff Maaza O'Brien without Video Recording. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 12/12/2014. (nk, Chambers)
December 11, 2014 Filing 80 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that, due to a conflict in the Court calendar, the MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Peter J. Messitte scheduled to begin at 10:00 a.m. on Monday, March 2, 2015 has been rescheduled to begin at 11:30 a.m. on that same day (Courtroom 4C). (rass, Chambers)
December 9, 2014 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Order a Rule 35 Medical Evaluation of Plaintiff Maaza O'Brien Without Video Recording filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Terranova, Jodi)
December 8, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Curtis Fogleman on behalf of LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. (Fogleman, Christopher)
December 8, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J Emig on behalf of LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. (Emig, Gerard)
December 5, 2014 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Order a Rule 35 Medical Evaluation of Plaintiff Maaza O'Brien Without Video Recording filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Replies due by 12/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Flash Drive), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Mitchell, Denis) (Exhibit 2 - Flash Drive rec'd 12/9/14 and filed separately). Modified on 12/11/2014 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2014 Filing 75 Supplemental to #71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. to Correct #71 (4) Exhibit B-2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit Correction B-2)(Terranova, Jodi)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #72 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/3/2014. (rass, Chambers)
December 2, 2014 Filing 73 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record advising that argument on #71 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment will be heard before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Monday, March 2, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom 4C). The parties will be allotted one and one-half hours for total argument. Counsel should advise in writing immediately if they expect oral argument to exceed the allotted time frame. PLEASE NOTE, however, that this motion may be decided on the pleadings before the date scheduled for argument. If so, you will be notified sufficiently in advance of that date. PLEASE ALSO NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (rass, Chambers)
December 2, 2014 Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Kaiser Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and any Opposition Thereto by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 12/19/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
November 26, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 12/15/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum and Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, B-1, B-2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for discovery. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/25/2014. (kdm, Chambers)
November 21, 2014 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Order a Rule 35 Medical Evaluation of Plaintiff Maaza O'Brien Without Video Recording by Civista Health, Inc., Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC, Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 12/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Adrian Goldszmidt, M.D.)(Terranova, Jodi)
November 20, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Marucci, Ashley)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #65 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Supplemental Health Care, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/10/2014. (rass, Chambers)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #64 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/10/2014. (rass, Chambers)
November 10, 2014 Filing 65 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant SHC Services, Inc. Only by SHC Services, Inc.. (Billiet, Christina)
November 10, 2014 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Modify The Scheduling Order by Civista Health, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michele)
October 6, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine B Yoder on behalf of Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Yoder, Katherine)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #61 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/27/14. (rass, Chambers)
August 27, 2014 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. Responses due by 9/15/2014 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
July 30, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Serra Aygun on behalf of Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Aygun, Serra)
July 15, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Bonner, Keith)
July 15, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Bonner, Keith)
July 1, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE by SHC Services, Inc. of Certificate of Defense (Billiet, Christina)
June 18, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Roegge, Bradford)
June 17, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith M Bonner on behalf of Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC (Bonner, Keith)
June 6, 2014 Filing 54 QC NOTICE: #53 Notice (Other) filed by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf2, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2014 Filing 53 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. Service Of Discovery (Farley, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jf2, Deputy Clerk).
May 28, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Terranova, Jodi)
May 20, 2014 Filing 51 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Roegge, Bradford)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #49 Request for Hearing/Trial. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/25/14. (rass, Chambers)
April 25, 2014 Filing 49 Request for Hearing/Trial (Mitchell, Denis)
April 16, 2014 Filing 48 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SHC Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SHC Holdco, Inc. for SHC Services, Inc... (Billiet, Christina)
April 16, 2014 Filing 47 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zurich North America for Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC.. (Roegge, Bradford)
April 16, 2014 Filing 46 QC NOTICE: #41 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by SHC Services, Inc. was filed incorrectly. ***Please refile Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement as corporate affiliations and/or those with financial interest should be entered when the system prompts you do to so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2014 Filing 45 (FILED IN ERROR- ATTY TO REFILE)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC. (Roegge, Bradford) Modified on 4/17/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
April 16, 2014 Filing 44 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC.(Roegge, Bradford)
April 15, 2014 Filing 43 CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien.(Mitchell, Denis) Modified on 4/18/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. (Farley, Robert)
April 15, 2014 Filing 41 (FILED IN ERROR- ATTY TO REFILE)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SHC Services, Inc.. (Billiet, Christina) Modified on 4/16/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2014 Deficiency Notice as to SHC Services, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/25/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Mullan Brown on behalf of SHC Services, Inc. (Brown, Neal)
April 14, 2014 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial by SHC Services, Inc..(Billiet, Christina)
April 14, 2014 Deficiency Notice as to Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 4/24/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, by Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC.(Roegge, Bradford)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting in Part #20 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 04/01/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2014 Filing 36 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A..(Farley, Robert)
April 1, 2014 Telephone Conference (re: #20 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order held on 4/1/2014 before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: N/A) (esp, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2014 Filing 35 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, by LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc..(Marucci, Ashley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 34 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C..(Terranova, Jodi)
April 1, 2014 Filing 33 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint, Civista Health, Inc. currently known as Univ. of MD Charles Regional Health Inc., d/b/a Univ. of MD Charles Regional Medical Center's Answer to First Amended Complaint & Defenses to First Amended Complaint by Civista Health, Inc..(Smith, Michele)
April 1, 2014 Filing 32 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Civista Health, Inc.. (Smith, Michele)
March 28, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. SHC Services, Inc. served on 3/25/2014, answer due 4/15/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
March 28, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC served on 3/25/2014, answer due 4/15/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
March 21, 2014 Filing 29 Summons Issued 21 days as to Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC, SHC Services, Inc.. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2014 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Civista Care Partners, Inc., Civista Health, Inc., Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc., Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC, filed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2014: #1 Amended Complaint Redline) (bas, Deputy Clerk).
March 14, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien For the clerk to issue summons (Mitchell, Denis)
March 14, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien For the clerk to issue summons (Mitchell, Denis)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #24 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/14/14. (rass, Chambers)
March 12, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint Redline, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Denis)
March 10, 2014 Filing 23 PAPERLESS CORRESPONDENCE to counsel/parties of record confirming that a TELECONFERENCE with Judge Peter J. Messitte has been scheduled for Tuesday, April 1, 2014 at 4:45 p.m. in connection with #20 Joint Report and Request to Modify the Scheduling Order. Counsel will initiate the teleconference to Chambers. (rass, Chambers)
March 10, 2014 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Civista Health, Inc.. (Smith, Michele)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM/ORDER re #18 Scheduling Order, #20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 Scheduling Order filed by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 03/07/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk).
March 6, 2014 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #18 Scheduling Order by Daniel O'Brien, Maaza O'Brien Responses due by 3/24/2014 (Mitchell, Denis)
February 21, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by R Scott Krause on behalf of LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. (Krause, R)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report Due July 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 02/20/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2014 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A..(Farley, Robert)
February 20, 2014 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. identifying Corporate Parent Medical Mutual Liabiilty Insurance Society of Maryland for Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A... (Farley, Robert)
February 19, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc..(Marucci, Ashley)
February 19, 2014 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Falck, Corporate Parent Falck USA, Corporate Parent LifeStar Response Corporation, Other Affiliate Arch Insurance Company for LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc... (Marucci, Ashley)
February 18, 2014 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Civista Health, Inc. d/b/a The University of Maryland Charles Regional Medical Center and Civista Care Partner, Inc., d/b/a The University of Maryland Charles Regional Care Partners Amended Answer and Defenses to Complaint by Civista Care Partners, Inc., Civista Health, Inc..(Smith, Michele)
February 18, 2014 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (Terranova, Jodi)
February 18, 2014 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc... (Terranova, Jodi)
February 18, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C..(Terranova, Jodi)
February 18, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Civista Health, Inc. d/b/a The University of Maryland Charles Regional Medical Center and Civista Care Partners, Inc., d/b/a The University of Maryland Charles Regional Care Partners' Answer and Defenses to Complaint by Civista Care Partners, Inc., Civista Health, Inc..(Smith, Michele)
February 4, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C. served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
February 4, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc. served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
February 4, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
February 4, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A. served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
February 4, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Civista Health, Inc. served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
February 4, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maaza O'Brien, Daniel O'Brien. Civista Care Partners, Inc. served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014. (Mitchell, Denis)
January 27, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Civista Care Partners, Inc., Civista Health, Inc., Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc., Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-4546128.), filed by Maaza O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Mitchell, Denis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plaintif of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Brien
Represented By: Denis Charles Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maaza O'Brien
Represented By: Denis Charles Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Napoleon Magpantay, III
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Kaslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Jodi V Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHC Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christina N Billiet
Represented By: Neal Mullan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civista Care Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Michele L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Permanente Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Jodi V Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Robert J Farley
Represented By: Andrew Timothy Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civista Health, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Michele L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Puneet Chopra
Represented By: Robert J Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeStar Response of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Fogleman
Represented By: Ashley L Voli
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: R Scott Krause
Represented By: Gerard J Emig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquidagents Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Serra Aygun
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Katherine B Yoder
Represented By: Keith M Bonner
Represented By: Bradford John Roegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?