Lupo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Louis M. Lupo
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2014cv00475
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Deborah K. Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Plaintiff 6/24/16 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/24/2016. (sat, Chambers)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Plaintiff 9/28/15 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/28/2015. (sat, Chambers)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Plaintiff 1/26/15 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/26/2015. (sat, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis M. Lupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chad King
Represented By: John S Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Drew Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?