Huynnh v. Massenya et al
Plaintiff: James Huynh
Defendant: Kodzo Massenya, Gabonese Republic, Charles Mbonke and Jean Legrand
Case Number: 8:2014cv01625
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 53 Motion to Appoint a Post-Judgment Examiner. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/17/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/23/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2/26/18)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/13/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/30/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynnh v. Massenya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Huynh
Represented By: Robert L Barr
Represented By: Christopher L Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodzo Massenya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabonese Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mbonke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?