Battle v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Jeffery Battle
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 8:2014cv02250
Filed: July 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Paul W. Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas E. Price, M.D. against Jeffery Battle; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/25/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 65 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/5/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/19/2016. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?