Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund et al v. Just Born II, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund and Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund
Defendant: Just Born II, Inc. and Just Born II, Inc. doing business as Goldenberg Candy Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00793
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund Satisfaction of Judgment (Clark, Julia)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER APPROVING #46 the parties' stipulation and AWARDING Plaintiffs $139,155.89 as attorneys' fees and $615.15 as costs. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/8/2018. (sat, Chambers)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION for Award of Attorneys' Fees on Appeal by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Julia)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION for Award of Attorneys' Fees on Appeal by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Julia)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION for Award of Attorneys' Fees on Appeal by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Julia)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #44 consent motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees on appeal is now due by June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/31/2018. (Chasanow, Deborah)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees on Appeal by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund(Clark, Julia)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MANDATE of USCA takes effect this date as to #34 Notice of Appeal filed by Just Born II, Inc. (krc, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 BILL OF COSTS by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice)(Clark, Julia)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT of USCA affirming the Judgment of the USDC as to #34 Notice of Appeal filed by Just Born II, Inc. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (Attachments: #1 Published Opinion, #2 Notice of Judgment)(krc, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER re: #37 Bill of Costs. Costs are denied without prejudice to filing a new bill of costs within fourteen days of the U.S. Court of Appeals issuing any mandate affirming judgment. See Guidelines for Bills I.F. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2017 (decs, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #38 motion for approval of a supersedeas bond in the amount of $306,818 and GRANTING a stay of all actions to execute on the court's March 20, 2017 judgment pending appeal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/10/2017. (sat, Chambers)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Consent MOTION For Approval of Supersedeas Bond and For Stay Pending Appeal by Just Born II, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 BILL OF COSTS by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund(Clark, Julia)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 USCA Case Number 17-1369 for #34 Notice of Appeal filed by Just Born II, Inc.. Case Manager - Joy H. Moore (krc, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #34 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #33 Order on Motion for Judgment, #29 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,, #28 Memorandum Opinion by Just Born II, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-6567624.(Scully, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED JUDGMENT ORDER ENTERING judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant in the amount of $255,264.16 (representing $103,391.98 in unpaid contributions, $1,532.98 in interest on those unpaid contributions, $10,339.20 in statutory damages, and $140,000 in attorneys fees). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/20/2017. (sat, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Judgment by Stipulation by Just Born II, Inc.(Scully, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATUS REPORT Joint by Just Born II, Inc.(Delaquil, Mark)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Just Born II, Inc.(Delaquil, Mark)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #24 motion for judgment on the pleadings, DECLARING that Defendant is statutorily bound by the schedule of contributions implemented by Plaintiff on October 27, 2015, for all employees performing work in job classifications covered by the collective bargaining agreement that expired on April 30, 2015, including employees hired after the parties' impasse in negotiations, STRIKING the first, second, third, and fourth affirmative defenses in Defendant's answer, DENYING #25 cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings, and PROVIDING Defendant until March 1, 2017, to file an amended answer. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/8/2017. (sat, Chambers)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/8/2017. (sat, Chambers)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Just Born II, Inc.. (Delaquil, Mark)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Liability filed by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund. Replies due by 9/15/2016. (Roth, Andrew)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Just Born II, Inc. Responses due by 9/1/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Delaquil, Mark)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Liability by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Liability)(Roth, Andrew)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER/ORDER CONFIRMING matters discussed and schedule set during the telephone conference. Plaintiffs will file a motion for judgment on the pleadings by June 24, Defendant's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment motion is due by August 15, Plaintiffs' reply and opposition is due by August 29, and Defendant's reply is due by September 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/26/2016. (sat, Chambers)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Telephone Conference held on 5/26/2016 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jay P Krupin. Directing attorney Jay P Krupin to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David A Rivkin. Directing attorney David A Rivkin to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark Wendell Delaquil. Directing attorney Mark Wendell Delaquil to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jay P. Krupin by Just Born II, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David B. Rivkin by Just Born II, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Wendell Delaquil by Just Born II, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Just Born II, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Just Born II, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Just Born II, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING that a telephone conference with counsel is scheduled Thursday, May 26, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Chambers will initiate the conference call. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/12/2016. (Chasanow, Deborah)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David B. Rivkin ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-6011186.) by Just Born II, Inc. (Scully, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Wendell Delaquil ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-6011174.) by Just Born II, Inc. (Attachments: #1 DC Court of Appeals Certificate of Good Standing)(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jay P. Krupin ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-6011098.) by Just Born II, Inc. (Attachments: #1 DC Court of Appeals Certificate of Good Standing)(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #8 Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Answer)(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Just Born II, Inc..(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Form by Just Born II, Inc. (Scully, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/6/2016 (bus, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund. Just Born II, Inc. served on 3/22/2016, answer due 4/12/2016. (Clark, Julia)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' complaint is now due by May 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/8/2016. (Chasanow, Deborah)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Plead, Answer or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint by Just Born II, Inc. Responses due by 4/25/2016 (Scully, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund. (Clark, Julia)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Just Born II, Inc. (bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/28/2016 (bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Just Born II, Inc. dba Goldenberg Candy Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-5916701.), filed by Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industrial International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons)(Clark, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund et al v. Just Born II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Born II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Born II, Inc. doing business as Goldenberg Candy Company
Represented By: Jay P Krupin
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Represented By: David A Rivkin
Represented By: Mark Wendell Delaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund
Represented By: Julia Penny Clark
Represented By: Andrew Dean Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund
Represented By: Julia Penny Clark
Represented By: Andrew Dean Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?