Rembold v. Helsel et al
Petitioner: Donald Gary Rembold
Respondent: David Helsel and Spring Grove Hospital Center
Case Number: 8:2016cv01569
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Harford
Presiding Judge: Paul W. Grimm
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/30/2017. (c/m 6/30/2017 aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Memorandum and Order referring 33 Motion to Amend to the Chief Judge; staying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/13/2017. (c/m 06/13/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPERSEDING MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/14/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(C/M 7/14/16)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/23/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6.24.16)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembold v. Helsel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Gary Rembold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Helsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Spring Grove Hospital Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?