Clem v. Kain et al
Plaintiff: Clem and James Clem
Defendant: Kain, Ivy Hill Asset Management, L.P., Robert M Couch, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, American Capital Agency Corp., Peter J Federico, Morris A Davis, Malon Wilkus, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Samuel A. Flax, John R. Erickson and Randy E Dobbs
Petitioner: H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan
Consolidated Plaintiff: William Wall
Case Number: 8:2016cv03215
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 199 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Position re Proposed Settlement in Delaware action (Smith, Craig)
September 3, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 8/28/17, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 5/9/17, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 2/9/17, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Case Management Conference held on 12/6/16, before Judge Thomas D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 26. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2019.(krcs, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting #162 Motion to Strike, the Second Amended Complaint is Stricken; Defendants will be required to re-file their Answers to respond to the operative Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/14/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of status telephone conference Proceedings held on 7/9/19, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 34. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019.(krc, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER directing the Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests within 30 days; denying without prejudice #161 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/9/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 191 Case Management Conference held on 7/9/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 190 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A telephone CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for July 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 07091000 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. (mbcs, Chambers)
June 27, 2019 Filing 189 Request for Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Scheduling Order)(Oster, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 188 STATUS REPORT Joint Submission on Proposed Schedules for Discovery by James Clem, William Wall(Smith, Craig)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling the 6/28/19 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze on 6/13/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
June 12, 2019 Filing 186 STIPULATION re 172 Order for Settlement Conference, Joint Stipulation to Vacate Settlement Conference by James Clem, William Wall(Smith, Craig)
June 12, 2019 Filing 185 Correspondence re: Enclosure of Letter to Delaware Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 184 Correspondence re: Response to Document 183 (Smith, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 183 STATUS REPORT providing the Court with copies of documents effectuating the settlement of the parallel action pending in the Delaware Court of Chancery by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Ivy Hill Asset Management, L.P., Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Roy, Amy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jon Myer Talotta (Talotta, Jon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re #161 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus.(Roy, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 180 Correspondence re: Ivy Hill Status Report (Smith, Craig)
May 22, 2019 Filing 179 STATUS REPORT by Ivy Hill Asset Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Labaton Sucharow)(Solomon, Paul)
May 10, 2019 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #161 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Smith, Craig)
May 10, 2019 Filing 177 STATUS REPORT , Notice of Settlement of the Delaware Action as to the Individual Defendants by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus(Roy, Amy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #175 Stipulation re #171 Order Joint Stipulation Providing for Correction of Name from American Capital Asset Management LLC, to Ivy Hill Asset Management L.P. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/8/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 175 STIPULATION re #171 Order Joint Stipulation Providing for Correction of Name from American Capital Asset Management LLC, to Ivy Hill Asset Management L.P., formerly known as American Capital Asset Management, LLC by James Clem, William Wall(Wedeking, Steven)
April 29, 2019 Filing 174 Correspondence re: Withdrawal of Pre-Motion Notice Regarding Proposed Motion to Strike (Smith, Craig)
April 26, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint filed by James Clem, William Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Craig)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PAPERLESS ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference to Friday, June 28, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Ex parte letters are now due by Friday, June 14, 2019. Counsel are advised to follow the instructions as set forth in the Letter Order for Settlement Conference [ECF #160]. The settlement conference will be held in my chambers (Suite 400) in the Greenbelt courthouse (6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze on 4/25/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting parties 14 days to either file a joint stipulation regarding the proposed amendment, or Plaintiffs shall file the Motion. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/23/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2019 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Support re #161 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by American Capital Agency Corp..(Haiber, Scott)
April 16, 2019 Filing 169 AMENDED ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint by John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus. (Attachments: #1 Redline Version of Amended Answer)(Oster, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Stipulated Order Regarding Non-Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Protection. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/16/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/16/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 166 AMENDED ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint by American Capital Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redline Version of Amended Answer)(Solomon, Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall Stipulated Order Regarding Non-Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Protection (Wedeking, Steven)
April 15, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall Stipulated Protective Order (Wedeking, Steven)
April 15, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall Plaintiffs' Pre-Motion Notice Re: Motion to Amend to Correct the Name of Defendant American Capital Asset Management, LLC to Ivy Hill Asset Management, L.P. (Wedeking, Steven)
April 12, 2019 Filing 162 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Roy, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 161 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Roy, Amy)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jillyn K. Schulze on 4/8/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
April 4, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephone conference held on 4/2/19, before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Total number of pages filed: 49. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber, 301-344-3104, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2019.(krc, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting Individual Defendants leave to file their proposed Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint by April 12, 2019; Granting Individual Defendants leave to file their proposed Motion to Stay Proceedings by April 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/2/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/2/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 156 Case Management Conference held on 4/2/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 155 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #154 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen J Oddo. Directing attorney Stephen J Oddo to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen J. Oddo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7903109.) by James Clem(Miller, Monica)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #152 Motion to Continue. The telephone case management conference currently scheduled for March 21, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to April 2, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss #143 Scheduling Order and #148 Status Report, as well as #144 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint, #146 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Stay Proceedings, and #147 Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Strike. New instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2019. (mbcs, Chambers)
March 14, 2019 Filing 152 MOTION to Continue (Unopposed Motion to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Paul)
March 11, 2019 Filing 151 PAPERLESS NOTICE that the telephone case management conference currently scheduled for March 13, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to March 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss #143 Scheduling Order and #148 Status Report, as well as #144 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint, #146 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Stay Proceedings, and #147 Notice of Intent to File a Motion to Strike. New instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date. (mbcs, Chambers)
March 11, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall re #148 Status Report Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Order on Schedule for Briefing and Hearing on Individual Defendants' Motions to Strike Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint and to Stay Action, and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain "Objections" and Affirmative Defenses from Defendants' Answers (Smith, Craig)
March 11, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall re #148 Status Report Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Revised Scheduling Order (Smith, Craig)
March 11, 2019 Filing 148 STATUS REPORT Initial Joint Status Report by James Clem, William Wall(Smith, Craig)
March 8, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall of Intent to File a Motion Strike (Smith, Craig)
March 8, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings (Oster, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 145 PAPERLESS NOTICE that the parties should be prepared to discuss #144 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Strike at the telephonic Rule 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for March 13, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Instructions for the call will be e-mailed to the parties at a later date. (mbcs, Chambers)
March 1, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus of Intent to File a Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Roy, Amy)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/28/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 142 ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca.(Roy, Amy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 141 ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint by John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus.(Oster, Matthew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 140 ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint (Defendant American Capital Asset Management, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC.(Solomon, Paul)
February 26, 2019 Filing 139 ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint by American Capital Agency Corp..(Haiber, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 138 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Clem, William Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sanders, Shane)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #115 Motion to Amend/Correct and Motion for Leave to File; Granting the Plaintiffs 14 days to file Amended Complaint identical in all respects to their proposed Second Amended Complaint attached to their Motion to Amend; Directing the Defendants to file an Answer within 14 days of the Plaintiffs' filing of their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/6/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/6/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 01/23/2019, before Judge Chuang. Court Reporter/Transcriber L. Bankins, Telephone number 301-344-3912. Total number of pages filed: 149. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019.(lkb, Court Reporter)
January 23, 2019 Filing 134 Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2019 re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by James Clem, William Wall before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Court to issue a ruling at a later date.(Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins - 2B) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 133 Correspondence re: Motion to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinberger, Ned)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER/NOTICE scheduling a hearing for January 23, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. re #115 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/10/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 131 QC NOTICE: #130 Notice of Change of Address. **Please make address change by selecting Utilities Your Account Manage Your Account. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven R Wedeking (Wedeking, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE by American Capital Asset Management, LLC re #128 Notice (Other), Letter in Response to H&N 10-31-18 Letter, Addressed to Judge Chuang Dated November 2, 2018. (Solomon, Paul)
October 31, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan re #114 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, of LETTER addressed to Judge Theodore D. Chuang dated October 31, 2018 re: the Dismissal Order entered July 3, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weinberger, Ned)
September 13, 2018 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to the AGNC Defendants' Opposition CORRECTION OF DOCKET #125 filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Wedeking, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to ACAM's Opposition CORRECTION OF DOCKET #124 filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Wedeking, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to the AGNC Defendants' Opposition filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Wedeking, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to ACAM's Opposition filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Wedeking, Steven)
August 17, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6-15-18, before Judge Chuang. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Marshall, Telephone number 301-344-3229. Total number of pages filed: 98. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018.(lcm, Court Reporter)
August 15, 2018 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus.(Roy, Amy)
August 15, 2018 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty filed by American Capital Asset Management, LLC.(Solomon, Paul)
August 15, 2018 Filing 120 PAPERLESS NOTICE that consistent with this Court's #117 August 2, 2018 Order, Defendants' Opposition Memorandum to the Motion to Amend the Complaint is due on August 15, 2018. (cg2s, Chambers)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #118 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in support of their Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint will be deemed timely if it is filed by September 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/15/2018. (cg2s, Chambers)
August 6, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by James Clem, William Wall (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wedeking, Steven)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying #116 Joint Stipulation and Requested briefing schedule; granting Defendants an Extension of time to file their Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2018 Filing 116 STIPULATION and Requesting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Joint) by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roy, Amy)
July 17, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, , MOTION for Leave to File Amended Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty by James Clem, William Wall (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Redline of [Proposed] Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #95 AGNC Investment Corporation and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting #94 American Capital Asset Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/3/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2018 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/3/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2018 Filing 112 Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2018 re #95 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Correction of Docket 93 filed by American Capital Agency Corp. before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Court took matter under advisement and will issue formal ruling at a later date. (Court Reporter: Linda Marshall - 2B) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2018 Filing 111 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #110 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Wedeking. Directing attorney Steven Wedeking to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven R. Wedeking (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7387827.) by William Wall, James ClemAssociated Cases: 8:16-cv-03215-TDC, 8:16-cv-03310-TDC(Miller, Monica)
June 13, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Thomas, Jr on behalf of John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Thomas, James)
June 4, 2018 Filing 108 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a HEARING on #94 Motion to Dismiss and #95 Motion to Dismiss, is scheduled for Friday, June 15, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Theodore D. Chuang at the United States Courthouse located at 6500 Cherrywood Lane in Greenbelt, Maryland. The specific courtroom for the motions hearing will be available the week of the proceeding on the Court's website. (cg2s, Chambers)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #104 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/28/2017. (cg2s, Chambers)
November 20, 2017 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Correction of Docket 93 filed by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus.(Park, Chong)
November 20, 2017 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Reply Brief in Further Support of American Capital Asset Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty) filed by American Capital Asset Management, LLC.(Solomon, Paul)
November 20, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Gary Kain, Peter J. Frederico, Prue B. Larocca, Morris A. Davis, Larry K. Harvey, Malon Wilkus, John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Robert M. Couch, Randy E. Dobbs and Alvin N. Puryear by American Capital Agency Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haiber, Scott)
November 20, 2017 Filing 103 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Arthur Luk. Attorney Arthur Luk will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2017 Filing 102 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #100 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John C Massaro. Attorney John C Massaro will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Arthur Luk (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7008438.) by John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus(Oster, Matthew)
November 17, 2017 Filing 100 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John C. Massaro (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7008323.) by John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus(Oster, Matthew)
November 17, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jude Oster on behalf of John R. Erickson, Samuel A. Flax, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Oster, Matthew)
November 3, 2017 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #95 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Correction of Docket 93 Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Consolidated Stockholder Derivative Complaint filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Sanders, Shane)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER on #96 Stipulation Providing for: (1) the Filing of an Omnibus Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; and (2) Agreed-to Page Limit for Omnibus Opposition Brief, filed by James Clem, William Wall. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/18/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2017 Filing 96 STIPULATION Providing for: (1) the Filing of an Omnibus Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; and (2) Agreed-to Page Limit for Omnibus Opposition Brief by James Clem, William Wall (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Sanders, Shane)
September 18, 2017 Filing 95 Corrected #93 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Correction of Docket 93 by American Capital Agency Corp. (Attachments: #1 Correction of Docket 93-1, #2 Correction of Docket 93-2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Correction of Docket 93-3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Haiber, Scott) Modified on 9/20/2017 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Opening Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Paul A. Solomon in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1 to Opening Brief, #4 Exhibit 2 to Opening Brief, #5 Exhibit 3 to Opening Brief, #6 Exhibit 4 to Opening Brief, #7 Exhibit 5 to Opening Brief, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Paul)
September 18, 2017 Filing 93 [SEE #95 FOR CORRECTED FILING] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Capital Agency Corp. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Scott Haiber, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Haiber, Scott) Modified on 9/20/2017 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2017 Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #88 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Shiposh. Directing attorney Michael Shiposh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2017 Filing 91 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amy D Roy. Directing attorney Amy D Roy to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2017 Filing 90 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David B Hennes. Directing attorney David B Hennes to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2017 Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John D Donovan, Jr. Attorney John D Donovan, Jr will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Shiposh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6873400.) by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca(Park, Chong)
September 7, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amy D. Roy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6873375.) by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca(Park, Chong)
September 7, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David B. Hennes (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6873355.) by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca(Park, Chong)
September 7, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John D. Donovan, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6873273.) by Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca(Park, Chong)
September 7, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Chong S Park on behalf of Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, Peter J Federico, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca (Park, Chong)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting Defendants leave to file the proposed Motions to Dismiss and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/30/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2017 Filing 82 Case Management Conference held on 8/28/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-KLS-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE by American Capital Agency Corp. of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Haiber, Scott)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Jude Oster, Arthur Luk, and John C Massaro terminated. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/24/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
August 23, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew J. Oster, Esq., John C. Massaro, Esq., and Arthur Luk, Esq., by American Capital Asset Management, LLC(Oster, Matthew)
August 23, 2017 Filing 78 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica R Kunz. Directing attorney Jessica R Kunz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ronald N Brown. Directing attorney Ronald N Brown to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 76 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert Scott Saunders. Directing attorney Robert Scott Saunders to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica R. Kunz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6846387.) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Solomon, Paul)
August 22, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ronald N. Brown (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6846356.) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Solomon, Paul)
August 22, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert S. Saunders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6846314.) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Solomon, Paul)
August 22, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Allan Solomon on behalf of American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Solomon, Paul)
August 14, 2017 Filing 71 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a telephone case management conference regarding the briefing schedule for the proposed motion to dismiss is scheduled for August 28, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date. In accordance with #5 the Case Management Order, Defendants are directed to file a Notice of Intent to File a Motion regarding the proposed motion to dismiss by August 24, 2017. (ka2, Chambers)
August 9, 2017 Filing 70 STIPULATION ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by American Capital Agency Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haiber, Scott)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying #46 Motion to Stay; denying #58 Motion to Intervene and in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay; Defendants are directed to file an Answer or other response to the Amended Complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2017 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S Katz on behalf of H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan (Katz, Daniel)
August 2, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Bucher Isbister (Isbister, John)
August 2, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Isbister, John)
July 25, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE by James Clem, William Wall re #46 MOTION to Stay , #58 MOTION to Intervene and in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Opinion)(Sanders, Shane)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elisabeth Walden terminated. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/8/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
June 7, 2017 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Intervene and in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay filed by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Isbister, John)
June 2, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus(Walden, Elisabeth)
May 24, 2017 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Intervene and in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay filed by James Clem, William Wall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Shane P. Sanders in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Intervene, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Craig W. Smith in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Intervene, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Scott F. Templeton in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Intervene)(Sanders, Shane)
May 24, 2017 Filing 59 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION to Intervene and in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay filed by American Capital Agency Corp., American Capital Asset Management, LLC, Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haiber, Scott)
May 10, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION to Intervene and in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isbister, John)
May 9, 2017 Filing 57 Case Management Conference held on 5/9/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: FTR - Diaz) (mtds, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan leave to file the proposed motion and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/9/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2017 Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ned Weinberger. Directing attorney Ned Weinberger to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ned Weinberger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6640447.) by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan(Isbister, John)
May 2, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan of Intent to File a Motion to Intervene (Isbister, John)
April 28, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by American Capital Agency Corp., American Capital Asset Management, LLC, Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Haiber, Scott)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #50 Motion to Intervene; directing H&N to file a Notice of Intent to File a Motion and scheduling a pre-motion conference. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/26/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Intervene by H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan (Attachments: #1 H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plans Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Isbister, John)
March 31, 2017 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by James Clem, William Wall.(Sanders, Shane)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #47 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion is now due March 31, 2017. Defendants' Reply is due April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2017. (ka2s, Chambers)
March 17, 2017 Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay by James Clem, William Wall (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
February 22, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay by American Capital Agency Corp., American Capital Asset Management, LLC, Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Haiber, Scott)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER setting briefing schedule for Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/16/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2017 Filing 44 Correspondence re: Motion to Stay Briefing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walden, Elisabeth)
February 9, 2017 Filing 43 Case Management Conference held on 2/9/2017 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR- S.Smith-2B.) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Walden on behalf of American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Walden, Elisabeth)
January 26, 2017 Filing 41 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE is scheduled to discuss #40 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Stay for February 9, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date.(ka2s, Chambers)
January 26, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus of Intent to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings (Haiber, Scott)
December 23, 2016 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Capital Agency Corp., American Capital Asset Management, LLC, Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus, filed by William Wall, James Clem. (Attachments: #1 Red-line (Identification of Amendments))(Sanders, Shane)
December 6, 2016 Filing 38 Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2016 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-Saah-2B.) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #36 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Consolidated Complaint. The Consolidated Complaint is now due on or before December 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/1/2016. (ka2, Chambers)
December 1, 2016 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Complaint by James Clem, William Wall (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
December 1, 2016 Filing 35 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE is scheduled to discuss #34 Notice of Intent to File Motion to Stay Proceedings for December 6, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date.(ka2, Chambers)
November 30, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus of Intent to File a Motion to Stay Proceedings (Haiber, Scott)
November 30, 2016 Filing 33 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Capital Agency Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Bethesda Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate AGNC Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate AGNC 2012, LLC, Other Affiliate Old Georgetown Insurance Co. LLC, Other Affiliate AGNC TRS, LLC, Other Affiliate AGNC Mortgage Management, LLC, Other Affiliate AGNC Management, LLC, Other Affiliate MTGE Management, LLC for American Capital Agency Corp..(Haiber, Scott)
November 7, 2016 Filing 32 QC NOTICE: #31 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by American Capital Agency Corp. was docketed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. **When docketing the statement, the Corporate Parent and/or Affiliates MUST be entered when the filer is prompted by CM/ECF to do so. Please docket the Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement correctly. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2016 Filing 31 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Capital Agency Corp. (Haiber, Scott) Modified on 11/7/2016 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
October 28, 2016 Filing 30 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Capital Asset Management, LLC. (Oster, Matthew)
October 28, 2016 Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Arthur Luk. Attorney Arthur Luk will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2016 Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John C Massaro. Attorney John C Massaro will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2016 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jon Myer Talotta. Directing attorney Jon Myer Talotta to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Arthur Luk (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6316267.) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Oster, Matthew)
October 27, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John C. Massaro (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6316244.) by American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Oster, Matthew)
October 27, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jude Oster on behalf of American Capital Asset Management, LLC (Oster, Matthew)
October 27, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jon M. Talotta (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6315898.) by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haiber, Scott)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Consolidating Actions and Appointing Lead and Liaison Counsel in Related Matters. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/21/2016. Associated Cases: 8:16-cv-03215-TDC, 8:16-cv-03310-TDC(aos, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2016 Filing 21 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Actions and Appointing Counsel by American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus. (Haiber, Scott)
October 19, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Haiber on behalf of American Capital Agency Corp., Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus (Haiber, Scott)
October 11, 2016 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Craig W Smith. Directing attorney Craig W Smith to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2016 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shane P Sanders. Attorney Shane P Sanders will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2016 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian J Robbins. Directing attorney Brian J Robbins to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2016 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig W. Smith by James Clem. The fee has already been paid.(Miller, Matthew)
October 7, 2016 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shane P. Sanders by James Clem. The fee has already been paid.(Miller, Matthew)
October 7, 2016 Filing 14 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Robbins by James Clem. The fee has already been paid.(Miller, Matthew)
October 6, 2016 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Clem needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2016 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Clem needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2016 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Clem needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shane P. Sanders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6275548.) by James Clem (Miller, Matthew)
October 5, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig W. Smith (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6275528.) by James Clem (Miller, Matthew)
October 5, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Robbins (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6275479.) by James Clem (Miller, Matthew)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/4/2016. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to American Capital Agency Corp., American Capital Asset Management, LLC, Robert M Couch, Morris A Davis, Randy E Dobbs, John R. Erickson, Peter J Federico, Samuel A. Flax, Larry K Harvey, Gary Kain, Prue B Larocca, Alvin N. Puryear, Malon Wilkus. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/22/2016. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE by James Clem re #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses (Miller, Matthew)
September 22, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Miller on behalf of James Clem (Miller, Matthew)
September 22, 2016 Filing 2 QC NOTICE regarding: #1 Complaint filed by James Clem. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses to #1 Complaint. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6251511.), filed by James Clem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clem v. Kain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Hill Asset Management, L.P.
Represented By: Ronald N Brown
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Represented By: Jessica R Kunz
Represented By: Arthur Luk
Represented By: Paul Allan Solomon
Represented By: Matthew Jude Oster
Represented By: John C Massaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Couch
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry K Harvey
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kain
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Capital Agency Corp.
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Federico
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris A Davis
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malon Wilkus
Represented By: Matthew Jude Oster
Represented By: Arthur Luk
Represented By: James William Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: John C Massaro
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prue B Larocca
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin N. Puryear
Represented By: Matthew Jude Oster
Represented By: Arthur Luk
Represented By: James William Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: John C Massaro
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Flax
Represented By: Matthew Jude Oster
Represented By: Arthur Luk
Represented By: James William Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: John C Massaro
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Erickson
Represented By: Matthew Jude Oster
Represented By: Arthur Luk
Represented By: James William Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: John C Massaro
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy E Dobbs
Represented By: David B Hennes
Represented By: Michael Shiposh
Represented By: Scott R Haiber
Represented By: Amy D Roy
Represented By: John D Donovan, Jr
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Represented By: Chong S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clem
Represented By: Brendan S Thompson
Represented By: Craig W Smith
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Steven R Wedeking
Represented By: Shane P Sanders
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: Stephen J Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: H&N Management Group, Inc. & Aff Cos Frozen Money Purchase Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William Wall
Represented By: Steven R Wedeking
Represented By: Shane P Sanders
Represented By: Monica Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?