The District of Columbia et al v. Trump Featured Case

The DC and Maryland attorneys general filed a lawsuit against President Donald Trump alleging that by continuing to do business with foreign governments, Trump is violating the Emoluments Clause of the US Constitution.

Plaintiff: The District of Columbia and The State of Maryland
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 8:2017cv01596
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Peter J. Messitte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2018 152 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 147 Notice of Appeal,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(krc, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 151 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump in his official capacity (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Lin, Jean)
December 17, 2018 150 Featured Case ORDER to Counsel Advising Plaintiffs, in their Response to the President's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal (ECF No. 148), and the President, in his Reply to any Response, are asked to address the questions of whether the Court can dismiss without prejudice the claims against President Trump in his individual capacity, and if so, whether it should do so. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/17/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 149 Featured Case ORDER directing that Plaintiffs shall submit their response to 148 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump no later than Wednesday, December 19, 2018; the President shall submit his Reply no later than 5:00 p.m., Friday, December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/14/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 148 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Consovoy, William)
December 14, 2018 147 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 124 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 136 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal, 135 Memorandum Opinion, 102 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 145 Scheduling Order, 111 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, 101 Memorandum Opinion, 123 Memorandum Opinion by Donald J. Trump. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-7729440.(Consovoy, William)
December 6, 2018 146 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 144 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patrick Strawbridge. Directing attorney Patrick Strawbridge to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 145 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Discovery: Status Report due by 5/2/2018.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/3/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 144 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Strawbridge (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7704086.) by Donald J. Trump(Consovoy, William)
December 3, 2018 143 Request for Conference (Consovoy, William)
December 2, 2018 142 RESPONSE re 141 Response Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Schedule filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Tulin, Leah)
November 30, 2018 141 RESPONSE re 138 Status Report regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule of Discovery filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
November 28, 2018 140 Featured Case REVISED MEMORANDUM/ORDER to Counsel of Record.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/27/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 139 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/27/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 138 STATUS REPORT Providing Proposed Schedule of Discovery by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Tulin, Leah)
November 13, 2018 137 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura C Beckerman (Beckerman, Laura)
November 2, 2018 136 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 the President's Motion for Leave to Appeal and for a Stay Pending Appeal; directing the Plaintiffs to submit a proposed schedule of Discovery within twenty (20) days. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/2/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/2/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Interlocutory) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and for A Stay Pending Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
September 17, 2018 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Interlocutory) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and for A Stay Pending Appeal filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Beckerman, Laura)
September 14, 2018 132 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting(Lin, Jean)
September 11, 2018 131 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laura Beckerman. Directing attorney Laura Beckerman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2018 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura Beckerman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7549117.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Tulin, Leah)
September 5, 2018 129 ANSWER to 95 Amended Complaint by the President in his official capacity by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
August 20, 2018 128 Featured Case ORDER approving 125 Joint Recommendation. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/16/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 127 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Interlocutory) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and for A Stay Pending Appeal by Donald J. Trump(Lin, Jean)
August 16, 2018 126 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 125 Joint Recommendation of the Parties filed by The State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/16/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2018 125 STATUS REPORT Joint Recommendation of the Parties by The State of Maryland(Tulin, Leah)
July 25, 2018 124 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ; directing parties to submit a Joint Recommendation to the Court Suggesting the next steps to be taken in the case; deferring ruling on 112 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/25/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2018 123 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/25/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2018 122 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/11/18, before Judge Peter Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marlene Kerr, Telephone number 301-344-3499. Total number of pages filed: 107. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018.(mmk, Court Reporter)
June 11, 2018 120 Motion Hearing continued from 1/25/2018 and held on 6/11/2018 re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Donald J. Trump - Argued - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, all as stated by and before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court to issue a written opinion) (Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 121 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER approving 119 Correspondence re: June 11, 2018 Motions Hearing. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 6/8/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2018 119 Correspondence re: June 11, 2018 Motions Hearing (Tulin, Leah)
May 25, 2018 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity filed by Donald J. Trump.(Consovoy, William)
May 18, 2018 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Gupta, Deepak)
May 18, 2018 116 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Brockmyer by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68)(Gupta, Deepak)
May 9, 2018 115 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 114 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman, Etc. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/9/2018. (rass, Chambers)
May 8, 2018 114 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project as Amici Curiae in Support of Neither Party With Respect to Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief)(Berlage, Jan)
May 2, 2018 113 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump to the Court (Lin, Jean)
May 1, 2018 112 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dimiss on Behalf of Defendant in His Individual Capacity)(Consovoy, William)
April 27, 2018 111 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Oral Argument (Partially Consented). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/27/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2018 110 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Oral Argument (Partially Consented) by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
April 24, 2018 109 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Consovoy on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Consovoy, William)
April 5, 2018 108 PAPERLESS NOTICE to counsel/parties of record confirming that a MOTIONS HEARING has been scheduled before Judge Peter J. Messitte for Monday, June 11, 2018 beginning at 10:00 a.m. (Location: Courtroom 4C). PLEASE NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (rass, Chambers)
March 30, 2018 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland. Donald J. Trump served on 3/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit B: Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation, # 3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Service)(McPhail, Stuart)
March 30, 2018 105 QC NOTICE re: 103 Affidavit of Service, filed by The District of Columbia and The State of Maryland was filed incorrectly. ***Please re-file document by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. The document has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 106 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER re date for Oral Argument regarding remaining issues raised in the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/29/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 104 Correspondence re: Statement of Interest by President Trump in His Official Capacity (McPhail, Stuart)
March 28, 2018 103 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Donald J. Trump, in his individual capacity on 3/26/2018, filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit B: Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation, # 3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Service) (McPhail, Stuart) Modified on 3/30/2018 (tds, Deputy Clerk).
March 28, 2018 102 Featured Case ORDER denying in part, granting in part without prejudice and deferring in part 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ; directing that a hearing to consider remaining arguments will be set. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/28/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2018 101 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/28/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2018 100 Statement of Interest by Donald J. Trump , in his official capacity, of Statement of Interest (Powers, James) Modified on 3/28/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 22, 2018 99 Summons Issued 60 days as to Donald J. Trump(bus, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2018 98 NOTICE by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland re 95 Amended Complaint For the clerk to issue summons (McPhail, Stuart)
March 19, 2018 97 Correspondence re: Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Professor Luke Beck, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Re Lambie)(Blackman, Joshua)
March 14, 2018 96 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Request to Delay Ruling (Litos, Stephanie)
March 12, 2018 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump, filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Redline Version)(aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2018 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER granting 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/12/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2018 93 RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint and to Apply the Pending Motion to Dismiss [DOC. 21] to the Amended Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
February 27, 2018 92 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1-25-18, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Marshall, Telephone number 301-344-3229. Total number of pages filed: 223. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018.(lcm, Court Reporter)
February 23, 2018 91 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint Certificate of Service by Steven M Sullivan on behalf of The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Sullivan, Steven)
February 23, 2018 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Amended Complaint, # 3 Amended Complaint - Redlined, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Steven)
February 7, 2018 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Small on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Small, Daniel)
January 29, 2018 88 Correspondence re: supplemental amici curiae filing relative to Plaintiffs' expected Rule 15 motion [ECF No. 86] (Blackman, Joshua)
January 26, 2018 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah J Tulin on behalf of The State of Maryland (Tulin, Leah)
January 25, 2018 86 Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2018 re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donald J. Trump before Judge Peter J. Messitte.(Court Reporter: Linda Marshall - 4C) (jmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2018 85 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING 78 Motion for Leave of Amici Curiae Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project to Be Heard at Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/18/2018. (rass, Chambers)
January 12, 2018 84 Featured Case MARGINAL ORDER approving 83 Joint Response of the Parties to the Courts December 15, 2017 and January 2, 20181 Orders. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/12/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2018 83 RESPONSE re 79 Order Joint Reponse of the Parties filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Litos, Stephanie)
January 10, 2018 82 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Loren AliKhan. Directing attorney Loren AliKhan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2018 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Loren L. AliKhan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7087723.) by The District of Columbia(Litos, Stephanie)
January 5, 2018 80 Featured Case ORDER Directing that during further proceedings in this matter, no person may possess or transport into Courtroom 4C any electronic devices, including cellular telephones, cameras, recording devices of any type including smart watches and smart pens, and/or computers, including laptops and tablets. This restriction shall not apply to employees of the United States District Court for the District of Maryland, the United States Marshal or his Deputies, Court Security Officers, counsel of record in this case, employees of state and federal law enforcement agencies, and/or investigators and employees of counsel representing parties in the case, provided those investigators and employees of counsel are identified to the United States Marshal in advance. Persons subject to this Order are advised not to bring any such electronic devices to the courthouse. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/5/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2018 79 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER re: Format for January 25, 2018 Hearing. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/2/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2017 78 MOTION for Other Relief for Amici to Be Heard at Oral Argument by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman(Blackman, Joshua)
December 31, 2017 77 RESPONSE re 76 Response Corrected Response filed by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman.(Blackman, Joshua)
December 29, 2017 76 RESPONSE re 68 Response, 66 Response, 69 Response, 67 Response,, 65 Response As Amici Curiae In Support of Defendant filed by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman.(Berlage, Jan)
December 22, 2017 75 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Jean)
December 22, 2017 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Shumate on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Shumate, Brett)
December 15, 2017 73 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/15/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2017 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER re clarification of 63 MEMORANDUM/ORDER granting 50 , 55 , 56 , 57 and 58 Motions for Leave to File Amici Curiae Briefs. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/14/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2017 71 MOTION Clarification re 63 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman(Berlage, Jan) Modified on 12/14/2017 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 1, 2017 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
November 28, 2017 69 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in support of 46 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Certain Legal Historians - John Mikhail, Jack N. Rakove, Gautham Rao, Jed H. Shugerman, Simon Stern. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 68 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in support of 46 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Former National Security Officials. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 67 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in support of 46 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Federal Courts Scholars - Bruce Ackerman, Matthew D Adler, Zachary D Clopton, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Frank Deale, Michael C Dorf, Former Government Ethics Officers, Daniel Hemel, Aziz Huq, Evan Tsen Lee, Jonathan S Masur, Jon D Michaels, Sandra L Rierson, Eli Savit, Peter M Shane, Joan Steinman, Arthur D Wolf, Brian Wolfman. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 66 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in support of 46 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Sarah P. Chayes. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 65 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in support of 46 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Former Government Ethics Officers. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Document Preservation Subpoenas; and permitting the Parties to serve subpoenas on third-parties for the sole purpose of preservation of documents. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/28/2017. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2017 63 Featured Case MEMORANDUM/ORDER granting 50 , 55 , 56 , 57 and 58 Motions for Leave to File Amici Curiae Briefs in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; setting a Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for 1/25/2018; stating that the deadline to Respond to any Amici Curiae briefs is 12/29/2017; and stating that any party that wishes to Reply must do so by 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/28/2017. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2017 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma L Freeman on behalf of Sarah P. Chayes (Freeman, Emma)
November 20, 2017 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilann M Maazel on behalf of Sarah P. Chayes (Maazel, Ilann)
November 16, 2017 60 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 53 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ilann M Maazel. Directing attorney Ilann M Maazel to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2017 59 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 52 & 54 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emma Freeman. Directing attorney Emma Freeman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/16/2017 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
November 14, 2017 58 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Certain Legal Historians on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Jed H. Shugerman, John Mikhail, Jack N. Rakove, Gautham Rao, Simon Stern (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amici Curiae by Certain Legal Historians on Behalf of Plaintiffs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxman, Melissa)
November 14, 2017 57 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Former National Security Officials (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spector, Phillip)
November 14, 2017 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Federal Courts Scholars in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Bruce Ackerman, Matthew D Adler, Zachary D Clopton, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Frank Deale, Michael C Dorf, Daniel Farber, Daniel Hemel, Aziz Huq, Evan Tsen Lee, Jonathan S Masur, Jon D Michaels, Sandra L Rierson, Eli Savit, Peter M Shane, Joan Steinman, Arthur D Wolf, Brian Wolfman (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Brief of Amici Curaie Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Federal Courts Scholars in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Zachariasiewicz, Jean)
November 14, 2017 55 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amica Curiae Sarah P. Chayes in Support of Plaintiffs by Sarah P. Chayes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, David)
November 14, 2017 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emma L. Freeman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6999735.) by Sarah P. Chayes(Sanford, David)
November 14, 2017 53 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ilann M. Maazel by Sarah P. Chayes. The fee has already been paid.(Sanford, David)
November 14, 2017 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ilann M. Maazel (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6999604.) by Sarah P. Chayes(Sanford, David)
November 14, 2017 51 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Sanford on behalf of Sarah P. Chayes (Sanford, David)
November 14, 2017 50 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Former Government Ethics Officers as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs by Former Government Ethics Officers(Singh, TeJinder)
November 14, 2017 49 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by TeJinder Singh on behalf of Former Government Ethics Officers(Singh, TeJinder)
November 7, 2017 48 AFFIDAVIT re 46 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Christopher C. Muller by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sellers, Joseph)
November 7, 2017 47 AFFIDAVIT re 46 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Rachel J. Roginsky by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sellers, Joseph)
November 7, 2017 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Sellers, Joseph)
November 2, 2017 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for Other Relief to Serve Document Preservation Subpoenas filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland.(Litos, Stephanie)
October 27, 2017 44 RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION for Other Relief to Serve Document Preservation Subpoenas filed by Donald J. Trump.(Lin, Jean)
October 25, 2017 43 MOTION for Other Relief to Serve Document Preservation Subpoenas by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: List of entities, # 2 Exhibit B: Document preservation requests, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Litos, Stephanie)
October 23, 2017 42 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/23/2017. (rass, Chambers)
October 23, 2017 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Taylor. Directing attorney Jonathan Taylor to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2017 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Deepak Gupta. Directing attorney Deepak Gupta to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2017 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan E. Taylor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6954909.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sellers, Joseph)
October 20, 2017 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Deepak Gupta (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6954890.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sellers, Joseph)
October 18, 2017 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christine Elizabeth Webber. Directing attorney Christine Elizabeth Webber to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2017 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christine E. Webber (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6946832.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sellers, Joseph)
October 17, 2017 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Sellers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sellers, Joseph)
October 16, 2017 34 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF MOTIONS HEARING and advising counsel/parties of record that argument on 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will be heard before Judge Peter J. Messitte on Thursday, January 25, 2018 beginning at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom 4C). PLEASE NOTE: Counsel should bring copies for both the Court and opposing counsel of the principal cases on which they intend to rely during oral argument. Please also highlight the appropriate text. (rass, Chambers)
October 13, 2017 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman L Eisen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eisen, Norman)
October 11, 2017 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carrie Severino. Directing attorney Carrie Severino to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2017. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2017 31 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert W Ray. Directing attorney Robert W Ray to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2017. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2017 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Josh Blackman. Directing attorney Josh Blackman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2017. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2017 29 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 28 Joint Motion for Briefing Scheduling and Extensions of Page Limits Regarding Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/10/2017. (rass, Chambers)
October 6, 2017 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction , Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McPhail, Stuart)
October 6, 2017 27 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Scholar Seth Barrett Tillman and Judicial Education Project as Amici Curiae In Support of Defendant by Judicial Education Project, Seth Barrett Tillman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief)(Berlage, Jan)
October 6, 2017 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Ingham Berlage on behalf of Judicial Education Project (Berlage, Jan)
October 5, 2017 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carrie Severino (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6930253.) by Seth Barrett Tillman(Berlage, Jan)
October 5, 2017 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Ray (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6930246.) by Seth Barrett Tillman(Berlage, Jan)
October 5, 2017 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Michael Blackman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6930237.) by Seth Barrett Tillman(Berlage, Jan)
October 5, 2017 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Ingham Berlage on behalf of Seth Barrett Tillman (Berlage, Jan)
September 29, 2017 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand for Lack of Jurisdiction by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Lin, Jean)
September 20, 2017 20 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/20/2017. (rass, Chambers)
September 19, 2017 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
September 7, 2017 18 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for Limited Intervention and Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/7/2017. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2017 17 MOTION for Limited Intervention and Emergency Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Joseph Crussiah. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Envelope)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2017 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Powers on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Powers, James)
July 19, 2017 15 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (until September 29, 2017). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/18/2017. (rass, Chambers)
July 18, 2017 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response to the Complaint by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean)
July 18, 2017 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Lin, Jean)
July 5, 2017 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland. Donald J. Trump served on 6/27/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt Proof of Service - Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Receipt Proof of Service - President Donald J. Trump, # 3 Receipt Proof of Service - United States Attorney General)(McPhail, Stuart) Modified on 7/10/2017 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
June 22, 2017 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephanie E Litos. Directing attorney Stephanie E Litos to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2017 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stuart C McPhail. Directing attorney Stuart C McPhail to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2017 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Noah D Bookbinder. Directing attorney Noah D Bookbinder to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2017 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie E. Litos (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6730058.) by The District of Columbia(Ludaway, Natalie)
June 14, 2017 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stuart McPhail (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6719724.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Addendum)(Sullivan, Steven)
June 14, 2017 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Noah Bookbinder (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6719663.) by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland(Sullivan, Steven)
June 12, 2017 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Hughes on behalf of The State of Maryland (Hughes, Patrick)
June 12, 2017 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2017 3 NOTICE by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland proposed summons for Jefferson B. Sessions, III (Sullivan, Steven)
June 12, 2017 2 NOTICE by The State of Maryland proposed summons for Stephen M. Schenning (Sullivan, Steven)
June 12, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637030093), filed by The District of Columbia, The State of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The District of Columbia et al v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The District of Columbia
Represented By: Noah D Bookbinder
Represented By: Stephanie E Litos
Represented By: Natalie O Ludaway
Represented By: Stuart C McPhail
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Maryland
Represented By: Noah D Bookbinder
Represented By: Patrick Hughes
Represented By: Stuart C McPhail
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?