Moore v. Peitzmeier et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Moore
Defendant: Catherine Brewer, Artemis Goode, Joshua Swecker, Joseph Alvarez, Roderick Cox, Thomas Conlon, John Christ, Montgomery County, Maryland, Douglas Miller, Michael Peitzmeier, Samuel Supnick, Nathan Lenhart, Yvesdidier Nkodia, Marcus Hendricks and Christopher Diez-Canseco
Case Number: 8:2018cv02151
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER approving #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; dismissing without prejudice Defendants Brewer, Christ, Conlon, Cox, Diez-Canseco, Goode, Hendricks, Supnick and Swecker; partially dismissing without prejudice as to Defendant Miller. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/12/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Victoria Haggerty on behalf of Joseph Alvarez, Nathan Lenhart, Douglas Miller, Montgomery County, Maryland, Yvesdidier Nkodia, Michael Peitzmeier (Haggerty, Patricia)
September 10, 2018 10 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Reply or Response to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint is now due September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/10/18. (nrs, Chambers)
September 7, 2018 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Joseph Alvarez, Nathan Lenhart, Douglas Miller, Montgomery County, Maryland, Yvesdidier Nkodia, Michael Peitzmeier.(Kane, Patricia)
September 7, 2018 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Moore (Downs, Jason)
August 30, 2018 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Artemis Goode, Yvesdidier Nkodia, and Samuel Supnick. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph Alvarez served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018; Catherine Brewer served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018; John Christ served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018; Thomas Conlon served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Peitzmeier served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Roderick Cox served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018; Christopher Diez-Canseco served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018; Nathan Lenhart served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018; Douglas Miller served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018; Joshua Swecker served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (Attachment: #1 Envelope from Legal Papers Inc.) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2018 3 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/19/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Joseph Alvarez, Catherine Brewer, John Christ, Thomas Conlon, Roderick Cox, Christopher Diez-Canseco, Artemis Goode, Marcus Hendricks, Nathan Lenhart, Douglas Miller, Montgomery County, Maryland, Yvesdidier Nkodia, Michael Peitzmeier, Samuel Supnick, Joshua Swecker.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Alvarez, Catherine Brewer, John Christ, Thomas Conlon, Roderick Cox, Christopher Diez-Canseco, Artemis Goode, Marcus Hendricks, Nathan Lenhart, Douglas Miller, Montgomery County, Maryland, Yvesdidier Nkodia, Michael Peitzmeier, Samuel Supnick, Joshua Swecker filed by Christopher Moore. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637107617.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Peitzmeier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artemis Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Swecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Alvarez
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Maryland
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Miller
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Peitzmeier
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Supnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Lenhart
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvesdidier Nkodia
Represented By: Patricia Victoria Haggerty
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Diez-Canseco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Moore
Represented By: Jason Gregory Downs
Represented By: Michael Samuel Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?