Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 8:2018cv02155
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #3 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Identity) (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing of Motion for Leave at CM/ECF 3 by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.(1 CC AUSA 07/16/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference of Inability to Confer (Hoppe, Jon)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Prior to Rule 26 Conference by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7445423.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Jon Alexander Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?