U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Protocall Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: EEOC and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Protocall Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02535
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess Unger on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Unger, Jess)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Protocall Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018.(Salacuse, Maria)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/17/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Protocall Communications Inc on 08/20/2018 by EEOC. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Waiver of Summons)(Thompson, Eric)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Protocall Communications, Inc., filed by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Protocall Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protocall Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Eric Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Debra Michele Lawrence
Represented By: Maria Salacuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Eric Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Debra Michele Lawrence
Represented By: Maria Salacuse
Represented By: Jess Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?