Price Oil Co., Inc. v. Fox Television Stations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Price Oil Co., Inc.
Defendant: Fox Television Stations, LLC and Kristyn Leon
Case Number: 8:2018cv02626
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM Scheduling Hearing on all pending motions for December 12, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. (cmcs, Chambers)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Hearing re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion (Green, Walter)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Price Oil Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Walter)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Fox Television Stations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Charles D. Tobin and Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Fox Television Stations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Amended Notice of Removal (showing amendments), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fox Television Stations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Janene P. Bassett, #4 Declaration of Kristyn Leon)(Tobin, Charles)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Price Oil Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Walter)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File DVD Exhibit. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 9/20/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File DVD Exhibit by Fox Television Stations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 QC NOTICE regarding: #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Fox Television Stations, LLC. **Leave of Court is required to file a DVD as an Exhibit. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Fox Television Stations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Tobin, Charles) Modified on 9/14/2018 (Exhibit A - DVD rec'd 9/13/18 and filed separately)(kns, Deputy Clerk).
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Fox Television Stations, LLC re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Tobin, Charles)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fox Television Stations, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Tobin, Charles)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Fox Television Stations, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The Notice of Removal was filed with the following attachment missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (km4, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/27/2018. (km4, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Roger W Titus. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fox Television Stations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fox Entertainment Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. for Fox Television Stations, LLC.(Tobin, Charles)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL18-29209. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7524328), filed by Fox Television Stations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Tobin, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price Oil Co., Inc. v. Fox Television Stations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Television Stations, LLC
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Represented By: Charles D Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristyn Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Price Oil Co., Inc.
Represented By: Walter W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?