Advance Business Capital, LLC v. Healthcare Resource Network, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Advance Business Capital, LLC
Defendant: Joann Koutsioukis, Laura Bankeroff, Healthcare Resource Network, LLC, Vivos Acquisitions, LLC, Naveen Doki and Silvija Valleru
Case Number: 8:2018cv02647
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Joann Koutsioukis served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018.(Shuster, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Healthcare Resource Network, LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018.(Shuster, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Laura Bankeroff served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018.(Shuster, David)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #11 Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/6/2018. (Chasanow, Deborah)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Advance Business Capital, LLC (Shuster, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Naveen Doki served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Authorization to Accept Service)(Shuster, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Silvija Valleru served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Authorization to Accept Service)(Shuster, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. Vivos Acquisitions, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Authorization to Accept Service)(Shuster, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael W Ullman. Directing attorney Michael W Ullman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jared Ullman. Directing attorney Jared Ullman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Laura Bankeroff, Naveen Doki, Healthcare Resource Network, LLC, Joann Koutsioukis, Silvija Valleru, and Vivos Acquisitions, LLC.(km4, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: #1 Summons) (km4, Deputy Clerk).
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. Ullman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7527119.) by Advance Business Capital, LLC(Shuster, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jared A. Ullman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7527107.) by Advance Business Capital, LLC(Shuster, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Advance Business Capital, LLC (Shuster, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7527065.), filed by Advance Business Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Shuster, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advance Business Capital, LLC v. Healthcare Resource Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Koutsioukis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Bankeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Resource Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivos Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen Doki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvija Valleru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Business Capital, LLC
Represented By: David J Shuster
Represented By: Jared A Ullman
Represented By: Michael W Ullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?