Climbzone, LLC v. Washington et al.
Plaintiff: Climbzone, LLC
Defendant: CW3, LLC and Clifford Washington
Case Number: 8:2018cv02732
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to CW3, LLC and Clifford Washington. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Climbzone, LLC (McNutt, Philip)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Climbzone, LLC re #1 Complaint Summons - CW3, LLC (McNutt, Philip)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Climbzone, LLC re #1 Complaint Summons - Defendant Washington (McNutt, Philip)
September 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Climbzone, LLC re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (McNutt, Philip)
September 5, 2018 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/12/2018 (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Climbzone, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - summonses and civil cover sheet. To correct this problem, file summonses and civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link summonses and civil cover sheet to #1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clifford Washington, CW3, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7542044.), filed by Climbzone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Arbitration Award)(McNutt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Climbzone, LLC v. Washington et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Climbzone, LLC
Represented By: Philip J McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CW3, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?