United States of America v. Weiss et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Brett Weiss and Chung & Press LLP
Case Number: 8:2018cv02748
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6672
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Defendants' response to the Complaint is now due 11/5/18. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/24/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Brett Weiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed ORder)(Alberotanza, Giovanni)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Defendants' response to Complaint is due 10/25/18. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/11/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Brett Weiss(Alberotanza, Giovanni)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanni Alberotanza on behalf of All Defendants (Alberotanza, Giovanni)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Chung & Press LLP served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018.(Wagner, Nelson)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Brett Weiss served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018.(Wagner, Nelson)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/6/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Chung & Press LLP, Brett Weiss.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction against Chung & Press LLP, Brett Weiss, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Weiss), #3 Summons (Chung & Press LLC))(Wagner, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Weiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Weiss
Represented By: Giovanni Alberotanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chung & Press LLP
Represented By: Giovanni Alberotanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nelson Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?