Bacon v. Warden

Plaintiff: Jose Bacon
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 8:2018cv02797
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice #1 the Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/30/2018. (c/m 10/31/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days to file a Supplement to the Complaint and to either pay the filing fee or to file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/19/2018. (c/m w/ forms 9/20/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by Jose Bacon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?