Ahmed v. Branigan

Appellant: Lasker M. Ahmed
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan
Case Number: 8:2018cv02798
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant Brief by Lasker M. Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 4 Bankruptcy Letter to counsel and parties regarding briefs. (c/m 10/5/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/5/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 5, 2018 3 APPELANT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Lasker M. Ahmed re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Appellant Brief due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 BK# 56 Request for Amendment of Order Denying Confirmation, #2 BK# 74 Second Motion to Reconsider, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Supplemental Transmittal Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2018 2 Transmittal of Record re #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Greenbelt). (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (**NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED**) Modified on 10/2/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 14, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Southern). Bankruptcy Court case number 18-12957, filed by Lasker M. Ahmed. Appellant Brief due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lasker M. Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan
Represented By: Timothy P Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?