Mnyandu v. Harrison

Petitioner: Lindokuhle Mnyandu
Respondent: Sydney J. Harrison
Case Number: 8:2018cv02845
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER DENYING and DISMISSING #1 COMPLAINT (Writ of Mandamus); and CLOSING Case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/10/2018. (c/m to pet 10/11/2018 rss, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 2 Featured Case LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2018. (c/m 9/17/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (Writ of Mandamus) against Sydney J. Harrison, filed by Lindokuhle Mnyandu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mnyandu v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sydney J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lindokuhle Mnyandu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?