W.C. and A.N. Miller Development Company v. Capital One N.A.
Plaintiff: W.C. and A.N. Miller Development Company and W.C. & A.N. Miller Development Company
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02862
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by W.C. & A.N. Miller Development Company(Rost, Bradshaw)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 parties' joint request to extend the stay of this case for an additional 30 days. The next status report will be due 11/26/18.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/4/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Correspondence re: Settlement (Bass, Timothy)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's request for a 30-day stay of the proceedings while the parties seek to finalize a settlement. The case is stayed until Monday, October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Potential Settlement (Bass, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Capital One N.A. State Court Complaint (Bass, Timothy)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Capital One N.A. was filed incorrectly. **Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to #1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital One N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One N.A..(Bass, Timothy)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County Maryland, case number 4515230-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7560902), filed by Capital One N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bass, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.C. and A.N. Miller Development Company v. Capital One N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.C. and A.N. Miller Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.C. & A.N. Miller Development Company
Represented By: Bradshaw Rost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?