Jeffries v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Pamela Lynette Jeffries
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2018cv02868
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries. (Sanford, Scott)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries. (Sanford, Scott)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018.(Sanford, Scott)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/21/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/19/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Lynette Jeffries(Sanford, Scott)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Complaint, filed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries was filed incorrectly. **Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis was filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The Motion must be docketed separately using the correct event. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Attachment Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(Sanford, Scott)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 [FILED IN ERROR] COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by Pamela Lynette Jeffries.(Sanford, Scott) Modified on 9/17/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lynette Jeffries
Represented By: Scott Gerald Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?