International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O et al v. TK Services, Incorporated

Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O and Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A
Defendant: TK Services, Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2018cv02920
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER Approving #7 Notice of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/31/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2018 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O(Paul, Robert)
October 30, 2018 6 (FILED IN ERROR PER FILER) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O(Paul, Robert) Modified on 10/30/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 23, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O, Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A. TK Services, Incorporated served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018.(Paul, Robert)
September 24, 2018 4 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/24/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O identifying Corporate Parent International Union of Operating Engineers Loca 99 for Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O.(Paul, Robert)
September 24, 2018 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to TK Services, Incorporated. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 Deficiency Notice as to International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O and Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/1/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT To Collect Unpaid Contributions to Employee Benefit FUnd Under ERISA and the Labor-Management Relations Act against TK Services, Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7573244.), filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O, Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Summons)(Paul, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O et al v. TK Services, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99, 99-A, 99-C,99-O
Represented By: Robert Edward Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Health and Welfare Plan and Trust for the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 99 and 99A
Represented By: Robert Edward Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Services, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?