Olukoya et al v. Sowore et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Kolawale Olukoya, Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc. and Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc.
Defendant: Omoyele Sowore and Sahara Reporters Media Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02922
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants an extension of time until and including December 5, 2018 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/5/2018. (mbcs, Chambers)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Agreement to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (Gharbi, Rafiq)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Kolawale Olukoya, Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc.. Sahara Reporters Media Group, Inc. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018.(Gharbi, Rafiq)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Kolawale Olukoya, Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc.. Omoyele Sowore served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018.(Gharbi, Rafiq)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gilbert Garcia. Directing attorney Gilbert Garcia to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit of Service, filed by Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc., Daniel Kolawale Olukoya, #5 Affidavit of Service, filed by Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc., Daniel Kolawale Olukoya was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gilbert A. Garcia (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7648333.) by Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc., Daniel Kolawale Olukoya(Gharbi, Rafiq)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Demand for a Jury Trial and Civil Cover Sheet served on Sahara Reporters Media Group, Inc. on October 15, 2018, filed by Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc., Daniel Kolawale Olukoya.(Gharbi, Rafiq) Modified on 11/2/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Demand for a Jury Trial and Civil Cover Sheet served on Omoyele Sowore on October 15, 2018, filed by Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc., Daniel Kolawale Olukoya.(Gharbi, Rafiq) Modified on 11/2/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Schetelich on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schetelich, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/24/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sahara Reporters Media Group, Inc. and Omoyele Sowore. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Kolawale Olukoya, Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc., Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0416-7573574) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sahara, #3 Summons Sowore)(Gharbi, Rafiq) Modified on 9/24/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olukoya et al v. Sowore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omoyele Sowore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahara Reporters Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kolawale Olukoya
Represented By: Rafiq R Gharbi
Represented By: Gilbert A Garcia
Represented By: Thomas J Schetelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Inc.
Represented By: Rafiq R Gharbi
Represented By: Gilbert A Garcia
Represented By: Thomas J Schetelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain of Fire and Miracles Ministries, Bowie, Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Rafiq R Gharbi
Represented By: Gilbert A Garcia
Represented By: Thomas J Schetelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?