Iguodala v. Webb et al

Plaintiff: Brown E. Iguodala
Defendant: State of Maryland, Stuart Nathan and Wayne Webb
Case Number: 8:2018cv02966
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to mail this Order with 3 copies of U.S Marshal forms to Plaintiff; Granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to complete and return the Marshal forms to the Clerk with service copies of Complaint and Supplement of the Complaint; Directing Clerk to issue summons upon receipt of U.S Marshal forms and service copies; and Directing U.S Marshal to effectuate service of process. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/7/2018. (c/m 11/7/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint (Amended of Complaint) filed by Brown E. Iguodala (tds, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 28 days to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/1/2018. (c/m w/ forms 10/1/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brown E. Iguodala (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stuart Nathan, State of Maryland, and Wayne Webb filed by Brown E. Iguodala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment, #3 Summons)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iguodala v. Webb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown E. Iguodala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?