Proctor v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lelia H. Proctor
Defendant: Ally Bank and Ally Financial Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02989
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ally Bank, Ally Financial Inc.(c/m 11/6/2018 to plaintiff heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit completed summonses to the Clerk; failure to comply with the Court's October 5, 2018 Order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/2/2018. (c/m 11/2/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Lelia H. Proctor. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit completed summons to the Clerk and the Clerk shall issue summons an return summons to plaintiff for service. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/4/2018. (c/m 10/5/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/5/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 3, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 84637033153 (km4, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #3 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/2/2018. (c/m 10/2/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff Twendy-one (21) days from the date of this Order to pay full civil filing fee of $400.00 or file an amended Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/1/2018. (c/m 10/2/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE (Proposed Summons) by Lelia H. Proctor re #1 Complaint (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Lelia H. Proctor(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lelia H. Proctor (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Preventative Injunctive Relief) against Ally Bank and Ally Financial Inc., filed by Lelia H. Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lelia H. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?