Laster v. NAI, The Michael Companies

Plaintiff: Lisa Laster
Defendant: NAI, The Michael Companies
Case Number: 8:2018cv03200
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Laster. NAI, The Michael Companies waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018.(McCormick, Corlie)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/22/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Gary Michael on October 16, 2018 by Lisa Laster. Waiver of Service due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(McCormick, Corlie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Laster was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NAI, The Michael Companies ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7616177.), filed by Lisa Laster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormick, Corlie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laster v. NAI, The Michael Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAI, The Michael Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Laster
Represented By: Corlie McCormick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?