Flores v. HMS Host Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rolando Flores
Defendant: HMS Host Corporation and HMS HOST USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv03312
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Approve Settlement; approving Joint Stipulation of Settlement Agreement and Release; dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to lift the stay and close this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/18/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/18/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by HMS Host Corporation, HMS Host USA, Inc., HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Settlement of Collective Action Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of J. Russ Bryant, #4 Text of Proposed Order D - Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(Dow, Dustin)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by HMS Host Corporation, HMS Host USA, Inc., HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host CorporationAssociated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(Dow, Dustin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER: Parties are to submit a joint status report by June 18, 2021 advising the Court of settlement. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/11/2021. Associated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(tb2s, Chambers)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Autogrill Group, Inc., HMS Host Corporation, HMS Host USA, Inc., HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host CorporationAssociated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(Dow, Dustin)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER: Parties are to submit a joint status report by March 31, 2021 advising the Court of the status of the anticipated mediation. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/6/2021. Associated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(tb2s, Chambers)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Autogrill Group, Inc., HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host CorporationAssociated Cases: 8:18-cv-01395-PX, 8:18-cv-03312-PX, 8:18-cv-03322-PX(Dow, Dustin)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER instructing the parties to advise the Court by December 4, 2020, of the status of the case and the parties proposed schedule moving forward. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/24/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Joint MOTION to Stay and Toll Statute of Limitations; the case shall be stayed until 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/8/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Stay and Toll Statute of Limitations by HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation(Mersol, Gregory)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation.(Dow, Dustin)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/23/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/23/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 QC NOTICE: #18 Response in Support of Motion filed by HMS Host Corporation, HMS HOST USA, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect docketing event was used. The correct event is Reply in Response to Motion located under Responses and Replies. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation.(Dow, Dustin) Modified on 4/1/2019 to correct title (rss, Deputy Clerk).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rolando Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of J. Russ Bryant, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryant, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FLSA MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/12/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Janie Metcalf)(Dow, Dustin)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paula R Jackson. Directing attorney Paula R Jackson to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph R Bryant. Directing attorney Joseph R Bryant to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert E Turner. Directing attorney Robert E Turner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paula R. Jackson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7847058.) by Rolando Flores(Prawde, Alyse)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Russ Bryant (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7847052.) by Rolando Flores(Prawde, Alyse)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Turner, IV (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7847044.) by Rolando Flores(Prawde, Alyse)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension. Defendants' Answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is due March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/8/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by HMS HOST USA, Inc., HMS Host Corporation(Dow, Dustin)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rolando Flores. HMS HOST USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019; HMS Host Corporation waiver sent on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019.(Prawde, Alyse)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to HMS HOST USA, Inc. and HMS Host Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge Paul W. Grimm no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Rolando Flores re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Prawde, Alyse)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Rolando Flores re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Prawde, Alyse)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Rolando Flores was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Collective Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7638943.), filed by Rolando Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prawde, Alyse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. HMS Host Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Flores
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Robert E Turner, IV
Represented By: Joseph R Bryant
Represented By: Paula R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Host Corporation
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS HOST USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin Matthew Dow
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?