Quan v. TAB GHA F & B, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ky C Quan
Defendant: Matthew S. Yoo, TAB GHA F & B, Inc., I.L. Creation of Maryland, Inc. and Steve P Choi
Case Number: 8:2018cv03397
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS NOTICE that a pre-motion Case Management Conference is scheduled for January 10, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to discuss #12 Notice of Intent to File Motion. Instructions for the call will be emailed to the parties at a later date. DEFENSE COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO PROMPTLY ENTER AN APPEARANCE. No instructions will be provided to defense counsel unless and until an appearance is entered. (nrs, Chambers)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Notice of Intent to File Motion (Baroody, Neal)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert Farlow. Directing attorney Robert Farlow to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. Farlow (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7679888.) by Ky C Quan(Churchill, Mark)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/19/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/14/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Ky C Quan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Churchill, Mark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Steve P Choi, I.L. Creation of Maryland, Inc., TAB GHA F & B, Inc., and Matthew S. Yoo. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Steve P Choi, I.L. Creation of Maryland, Inc., Ky C Quan, TAB GHA F & B, Inc., Matthew S. Yoo or counsel for Steve P Choi, I.L. Creation of Maryland, Inc., Ky C Quan, TAB GHA F & B, Inc., Matthew S. Yoo are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/19/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ky C Quan (Churchill, Mark)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7650763.), filed by Ky C Quan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons TAB GHA F & B, Inc., #19 Summons I.L. Creations, #20 Summons Steve P. Choi, #21 Summons Matthew S. Yoo)(Churchill, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quan v. TAB GHA F & B, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAB GHA F & B, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.L. Creation of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve P Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ky C Quan
Represented By: Mark Hunter Churchill
Represented By: Robert J Farlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?