Perez Hernandez et al v. Triple Star Restaurant Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Marroquin Escalante and Luis Perez Hernandez
Defendant: Zhi Yuan Zhang, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation and Yan Wen Chen
Case Number: 8:2018cv03464
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 16 LETTER ORDER regarding telephone conference to discuss case schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Tentative Scheduling Order)(bc, Chambers)
January 4, 2019 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jules Pargament on behalf of Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang (Pargament, Jeffrey)
January 2, 2019 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang.(Pargament, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/26/2018. (em/s 12/26/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 11 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang or counsel for Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/21/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 (FILED IN ERROR) ORDER directing Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang and Yan Wen Chen to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. This Order shall be vacated if Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang and Yan Wen Chen files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/6/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/7/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time; answer due 1/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/4/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang(Pargament, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Perez Hernandez, Kevin Marroquin Escalante. Yan Wen Chen served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018.(Zelikovitz, Justin)
November 14, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Perez Hernandez, Kevin Marroquin Escalante. Zhi Yuan Zhang served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018.(Zelikovitz, Justin)
November 9, 2018 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Yan Wen Chen, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation and Zhi Yuan Zhang.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/9/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Yan Wen Chen, Kevin Marroquin Escalante, Luis Perez Hernandez, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang or counsel for Yan Wen Chen, Kevin Marroquin Escalante, Luis Perez Hernandez, Triple Star Restaurant Corporation, Zhi Yuan Zhang are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/26/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7663366.), filed by Luis Perez Hernandez, Kevin Marroquin Escalante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez Hernandez et al v. Triple Star Restaurant Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhi Yuan Zhang
Represented By: Jeffrey Jules Pargament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple Star Restaurant Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Jules Pargament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Wen Chen
Represented By: Jeffrey Jules Pargament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Marroquin Escalante
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Perez Hernandez
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?