Liu v. Bushnell et al

Plaintiff: Xunxian Liu
Defendant: David Shurtleff, Evelyn Cusson and Mary Catherine Bushnell
Case Number: 8:2018cv03468
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2018 15 Featured Case LETTER ORDER Granting #14 Defendant's Motion to Continue Pre-Motion Conference Call; the Pre-Motion call is now scheduled to take place on January 22, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/28/2018. (c/m 12/28/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2018 14 MOTION to Continue Pre-Motion Conference by Mary Catherine Bushnell, Evelyn Cusson, David Shurtleff (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly)
December 18, 2018 13 Featured Case LETTER ORDER that the Court has Schedule a pre-motion Telephone Conference call on January 2, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/18/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 12 Correspondence re: Request to File Motion to Dismiss (Marzullo, Kelly)
December 3, 2018 11 SECOND RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Xunxian Liu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rss, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2018 10 RESPONSE to #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Xunxian Liu. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2018 9 Featured Case LETTER ORDER to parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/28/2018. (c/m 11/28/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 8 MOTION for Discovery Order by Xunxian Liu (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2018 7 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Defendants' response to the Complaint is due 12/17/18. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/16/2018. (sb2s, Chambers)
November 16, 2018 6 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Mary Catherine Bushnell, Evelyn Cusson, David Shurtleff.(Marzullo, Kelly)
November 15, 2018 5 Featured Case Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by David Shurtleff, Mary Catherine Bushnell, Evelyn Cusson. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/15/2018. (c/m 11/15/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 4 Featured Case LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/13/2018. (c/m 11/16/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Mary Catherine Bushnell, Evelyn Cusson, David Shurtleff (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzullo, Kelly)
November 9, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Marzullo, Kelly)
November 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 455587-V., filed by Mary Catherine Bushnell, Evelyn Cusson, David Shurtleff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Summons to Bushnell as filed in State Court, #4 Summons to Shurleff as filed in State Court, #5 Summons to Cusson as filed in State Court, #6 Complaint as filed in State Court, #7 Civil Case Information Sheet as filed in State Court, #8 Letter from Court Assigning Case Number as filed in State Court, #9 Scheduling Notice as filed in State Court, #10 Order for Mandatory Scheduling Conference as filed in State Court, #11 Scheduling Order as filed in State Court, #12 Request for Interpreter as filed in State Court)(Marzullo, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Bushnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shurtleff
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Cusson
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Catherine Bushnell
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xunxian Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?