Woods v. Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority et al

Plaintiff: Silvester Woods
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority and Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689
Case Number: 8:2018cv03494
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e-2 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689.(Tyler, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority.(Coel, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER ORDER denying #25 Complaint and Request for Injunction, construed as a Motion for Injunction. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/28/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Injunction Order by Silvester Woods.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Silvester Woods re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Silvester Woods (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment)(Tyler, Paul)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Silvester Woods (cs 02/01/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coel, Michael)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 and Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority, filed by Silvester Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER summarizing the telephone conference call held on 12/18/2018; scheduling deadlines for further pleadings and motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Return Letter Order mailed to Silvester Woods. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 12/19/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 Status Conference held on 12/18/2018 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike by Silvester Woods re #10 Motion to Dismiss.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Silvester Woods. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER striking for non compliance #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/13/2018. (c/m 12/13/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Silvester Woods (c/m 12/12/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 (Tyler, Paul)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 (STRICKEN SEE #13 ORDER) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit)(Tyler, Paul) Modified on 12/13/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER scheduling a pre-motion telephone conference call for Tuesday, December 18, 2018 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/7/2018. (c/m 12/07/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Coel, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority (Coel, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Coel on behalf of Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority (Coel, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 and Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete and return US Marshal Forms; directing the Clerk to issue summons for Marshal service upon receipt. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/16/2018. (c/m/w/forms 11/19/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/14/2018. (c/m 11/14/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Silvester Woods (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689 and Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority, filed by Silvester Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority
Represented By: Michael Richard Coel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union, Local 689
Represented By: Paul Mackenzie Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvester Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?