Lin et al v. Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Wanrong Lin and Hui Fang Dong
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello, Dorothy Herrera-Niles, Kirstjen Nielsen and Terry Kokolis
Case Number: 8:2018cv03548
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/8/2019. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Dorothy Herrera-Niles, Terry Kokolis, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello(Kurz, Julian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian M Kurz on behalf of Dorothy Herrera-Niles, Terry Kokolis, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello (Kurz, Julian)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hui Fang Dong, Wanrong Lin (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Patricia Minikon, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Wanrong Lin, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Hui Fang Dong, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rocah, David)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be due on December 19, 2018, Hearing is scheduled for February 7, 2019 at 9:00 a.m; ORDER that the Temporary Restraining Order issued on November 19, 2018 will remain in effect until the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is decided by the Court. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/14/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Durwood Riedel on behalf of All Defendants (Riedel, Durwood)
December 14, 2018 PAPERLESS Correspondence scheduling a telephone conference call for Friday, December 14, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are instructed to dial-in for the call: 877-810-9415; access code: 5860700. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Request for Conference (Rocah, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT , joint by Dorothy Herrera-Niles, Terry Kokolis, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello(LeDuc, Vickie)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Temporary Restraining Order issued on November 19, 2018 is extended for another fourteen (14) days, or until further Order from the Court. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/3/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Status Report Submitted by Dorothy Herrera-Niles, Terry Kokolis, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello (Loucks, Allen)
November 20, 2018 Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2018 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen F Loucks on behalf of All Defendants (Loucks, Allen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of All Defendants (LeDuc, Vickie)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/19/2018. (Hazel, George)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Correspondence re: legal issues (LeDuc, Vickie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2018 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal filed by Hui Fang Dong, Wanrong Lin before Judge George Jarrod Hazel.(Court Reporter: Linda Marshal 4A) (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Court's Jurisdiction re: TRO Hearing (Rocah, David)
November 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Stay of Removal by Hui Fang Dong, Wanrong Lin (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Hui Fang Dong, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rocah, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for a Write of Habeas Corpus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7678529.), filed by Hui Fang Dong, Wanrong Lin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rocah, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Represented By: Julian M Kurz
Represented By: Durwood Riedel
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dorothy Herrera-Niles
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Represented By: Julian M Kurz
Represented By: Durwood Riedel
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Represented By: Julian M Kurz
Represented By: Durwood Riedel
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Kokolis
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Represented By: Julian M Kurz
Represented By: Durwood Riedel
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wanrong Lin
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Maria E Rodriguez
Represented By: Nathaniel S Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hui Fang Dong
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Maria E Rodriguez
Represented By: Nathaniel S Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?