United States of America v. $213,573 U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $213,573 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Ricardo Carty and Patti Ann Amoy Chaplin
Case Number: 8:2018cv03565
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM for Property by Patti Ann Amoy Chaplin. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM for Property by Ricardo Carty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Process Receipt and Return (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER directing United States of America to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if United States of America files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/7/2018. (km4, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing United States of America to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/28/2018 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if United States of America files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/7/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 11/20/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. United States of America or counsel for United States of America are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/4/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem issued. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal Form) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $213,573 U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $213,573 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $213,573 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ray Daniel McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ricardo Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patti Ann Amoy Chaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?