Technopref Industries, Inc.
Petitioner: Technopref Industries, Inc.
In Re: technopref
Case Number: 8:2018cv03732
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Action Brought for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER accepting the $1,000.00 deposit delivered to this Court as security for costs. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/18/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Enjoining Suit. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/18/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas C Sullivan. Directing attorney Thomas C Sullivan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert Parrish. Directing attorney Robert Parrish to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/10/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas C. Sullivan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7717214.) by Technopref Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert B. Parrish (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7717181.) by Technopref Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
December 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/6/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/6/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Technopref Industries, Inc. or counsel for Technopref Industries, Inc. are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/20/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/6/2018 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Technopref Industries, Inc., technopref re #1 Complaint, of Errata to proposed Order Enjoining Suit (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected proposed Order Enjoining Suit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Redlined version)(Magid, Creighton)
December 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against technopref ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7708260.), filed by technopref. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Value, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Pending Freight, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Enjoining Suit)(Magid, Creighton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technopref Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: technopref
Represented By: Creighton Reid Magid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Technopref Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B Parrish
Represented By: Creighton Reid Magid
Represented By: Thomas C Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?