Bonnett v. Warden

Plaintiff: James E. Bonnett
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 8:2018cv03747
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment under Rule 56(c) (2) FRCP by James E. Bonnett (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James E. Bonnett (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER directing Counsel to show cause within 21 days. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/7/2019. (c/m 1/8/2019 sp2, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/6/2018. (c/m 12/7/18 nu, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by James E. Bonnett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nu, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnett v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?