Wilson v Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority et al.

Plaintiff: Mr Jesse Wilson and Jesse Wilson, III
3Rd Party Defendant: WMATA and Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Mr Jorge Flores and Jorge Flores
Case Number: 8:2018cv03766
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jorge Flores identifying Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY for Jorge Flores.(Neal, Rotrica)
January 7, 2019 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Jorge Flores was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2019 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jorge Flores identifying Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY for Jorge Flores.(Neal, Rotrica)
January 4, 2019 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Notice (Other) filed by Jorge Flores was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Form must be docketed seperately. Please re-file the document using the event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bus, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 9 (FILED IN ERROR) - NOTICE by Jorge Flores Disclosure of Corp Interest (Neal, Rotrica) Modified on 1/4/2019 (bus, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2019 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rotrica Shalice Neal on behalf of Jorge Flores (Neal, Rotrica)
January 2, 2019 7 (Refiled at ECF 8) - Line of Appearance ANSWER to Complaint by Jorge Flores.(Neal, Rotrica) Modified on 1/4/2019 (bus, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/10/2018. (c/m 12/10/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 5 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 12/10/18 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2018 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority was filed incorrectly. **Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to #1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Roger W Titus. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2018 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WMATA identifying Corporate Parent WMATA for WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
December 7, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint by WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Prince George's County, case number 050200038442018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7713740), filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandonnet, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Jesse Wilson
Represented By: Daniel Bastien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Wilson, III
Represented By: Daniel Bastien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WMATA
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Washington Metropolitan Transit Authority
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Mr Jorge Flores
Represented By: Thomas Kiernan Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jorge Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?